Mayssami Diamond, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Mayssami Diamond, Inc.
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America and Does 1 Through 10
Case Number: 3:2020cv01230
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Ruben B Brooks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Sung, Edmond)(jrm).
August 26, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Strike Claim for Damages Related to Plaintiff's Unfair Competition Claims filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Sung, Edmond) (jrm).
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Accepting re #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, from Plaintiff Mayssami Diamond, Inc.. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ.L. Rule 7.1 or 47.1 - Document(s) not timely per Order 12 Plaintiff must file its responses to Defendants motion to dismiss and motion to strike by August 12, 2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(jrm)
August 13, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Strike Claim for Damages Related to Plaintiff's Unfair Competition Claims filed by Mayssami Diamond, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bottini, Francis) (jrm).
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint filed by Mayssami Diamond, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bottini, Francis) (jrm).
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Motin to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. Plaintiff must file its responses to Defendant's motion to dismiss and motion to strike by 8/12/2020. Defendant must file its replies in further support of both motions by 8/26/2020. The hearing on both motions is continued to 9/24/2020, at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/27/2020. (jrm)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Gregory Varga, re #9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/27/2020.(rmc)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Josiah Butts, re #8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/27/2020.(rmc)
July 27, 2020 Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14222535.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Varga, Gregory) (rmc).
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14222429.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Butts, Josiah) (rmc).
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Order Modifying Briefing Schedule on Defendants Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike by Mayssami Diamond, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bottini, Francis) (jrm).
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance As Counsel of Record by Randy M. McElvain on behalf of Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (McElvain, Randy)Attorney Randy M. McElvain added to party Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (jrm).
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #4 MOTION to Strike Claim for Damages Related to Plaintiff's Unfair Competition Claims, #3 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint : Responses due by 7/22/2020 Replies due by 7/29/2020.(no document attached) (sc)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Strike Claim for Damages Related to Plaintiff's Unfair Competition Claims by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Strike)(Sung, Edmond)(jrm).
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Sung, Edmond) (jrm).
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies Inc. for Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (vxc) (dsn)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2020-00016241-CU-FR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14089187.), filed by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1230-AJB-RBB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case.(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayssami Diamond, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Edmond Sung
Represented By: Randy M. McElvain
Represented By: Josiah Tyler Butts
Represented By: Gregory Paul Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayssami Diamond, Inc.
Represented By: Francis A. Bottini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?