U.S. Bank National Association v. Access Companies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Access Destination Services, LLC and Access Companies, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01234
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Default Judgment in Favor of U.S. Bank National Association by U.S. Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proof of Service)(Masaitis, Peter) (mme).
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's DEFAULT JUDGMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: that Partial Default Judgment is entered as to the First Cause of Action (breach of contract) against Defendant Access Companies LLC ("Access"), Second Cause of Action (conversion) against all defendants, Third Cause of Action (unjust enrichment/restitution) against all defendants, Fourth Cause of Action (money had and received) against Access, and Fifth Cause of Action (open book account)against Access. Default Judgment shall be entered in the total amount of $1,070,200.00.(mme)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Entry of Clerk Default Judgment against Defendants Access Companies, LLC and Access Destination Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter E. Masaitis, #2 [Proposed] Default Judgment, #3 Proof of Service)(Masaitis, Peter) (mme).
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by U.S. Bank National Association without Prejudice of Causes of Action Six through Nine (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Masaitis, Peter) (mme).
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Access Companies, LLC, Access Destination Services, LLC (mme)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Access Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Masaitis, Peter) (mme).
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Access Destination Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Masaitis, Peter) (mme).
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association. Access Destination Services, LLC served. (Masaitis, Peter) (mme).
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association. Access Companies, LLC served. (Masaitis, Peter) (mme).
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp. for U.S. Bank National Association. (Masaitis, Peter) (mme) (dsn)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (vxc) (dsn)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Access Companies, LLC, Access Destination Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14094954.), filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1234-BEN-BLM. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Masaitis, Peter)(vxc)(dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Access Companies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access Destination Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Access Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Peter Masaitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?