Jackson v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joanne Jackson
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Centocor Research & Development, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Inc., DOES 1-100, Johnson & Johnson, IVAX Corporation, Janssen Research & Development L.L.C., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Baker Cummins Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson Research & Development, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01266
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Referring Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Inc., IVAX Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Inc., IVAX Corporation.. (Watson, Thomas) (sjt).
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Inc., IVAX Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Watson, Thomas)Attorney Thomas R. Watson added to party Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas R. Watson added to party IVAX Corporation(pty:dft) (sjt).
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on #3 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/6/2020. (sjt)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Party with Financial Interest by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Centocor Research & Development, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development L.L.C., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Fukuoka, Nicole)Attorney Nicole R. Fukuoka added to party Centocor Research & Development, Inc.(pty:dft) (sjt).
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Centocor Research & Development, Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development L.L.C., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Fukuoka, Nicole) (sjt).
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development L.L.C., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Fukuoka, Nicole)Attorney Nicole R. Fukuoka added to party Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole R. Fukuoka added to party Janssen Ortho LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole R. Fukuoka added to party Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Nicole R. Fukuoka added to party Janssen Research & Development L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole R. Fukuoka added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole R. Fukuoka added to party Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft) (sjt).
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (sjt).
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Centocor Research & Development, Inc., DOES 1-100, IVAX Corporation, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development L.L.C., Johnson & Johnson, Orthomcneil Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14117970.), filed by Joanne Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1266-JM-BLM. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Jones, Denise)(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole R. Fukuoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centocor Research & Development, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole R. Fukuoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Ortho LLC
Represented By: Nicole R. Fukuoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Norton Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Nicole R. Fukuoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IVAX Corporation
Represented By: Thomas R. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development L.L.C.
Represented By: Nicole R. Fukuoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole R. Fukuoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Nicole R. Fukuoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Nicole R. Fukuoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Cummins Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole R. Fukuoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Research & Development, L.L.C.
Represented By: Nicole R. Fukuoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Jackson
Represented By: Denise E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?