Strackaline v. Tredway et al
Plaintiff: Strackaline
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Joe Peterson and Andrew Tredway
Case Number: 3:2020cv01334
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER #3 Remanding Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. The Court remands the action to the Superior Court of California, County of San Diego for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/19/2020.(Certified copy sent to State Court via US Mail Service.)(sxa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 NON Opposition re #3 Ex Parte MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Joe Peterson, Andrew Tredway. (Buche, John) (sxa).
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference. Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/14/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 8/4/2020.(sxa)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Strackaline by Andrew Tredway, Joe Peterson.(Buche, John) (sxa).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Minute ORDER: The Court schedules a hearing on Plaintiff's motion to remand to state court (Doc. No. #3 ) for August 31, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. For future motions, all parties must comply with Local Rule 7.1 and obtain a hearing date from the Court before filing the motion. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/21/2020. (no document attached) (smy)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION to Remand to State Court by Strackaline. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memo of points and authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jim Stracka)(Levinson, Daniel)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael M. Anello is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv1334-H-KSC.(no document attached) (sjt)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2020-00023034-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14161767.), filed by Andrew Tredway, Joe Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint Included)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1334-MMA-KSC. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strackaline v. Tredway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Peterson
Represented By: John K. Buche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Tredway
Represented By: John K. Buche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strackaline
Represented By: Daniel Saul Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?