In Re: Stewart Neil Mayer
Appellee: Stewart Neil Mayer
Appellant: Robert J. Harrington
Case Number: 3:2020cv01369
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Leave to File [Appellants Ex Parte Request for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities to Opposition to Motion for Leave to File an Interlocutory Appeal] filed by Stewart Neil Mayer. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Of Appellee's Opposition To Appellant's Ex Parte Request To File a Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Keehn, L) (dlg).
August 18, 2020 Filing 19 Notice re RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION for Leave to File [Appellants Ex Parte Request for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities to Opposition to Motion for Leave to File an Interlocutory Appeal] Objecting to The Ex Parte Request For Leave filed by Stewart Neil Mayer. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Appelle's Notice of Intent To Oppose Ex Parte Motion For Leave To File Reply)(Keehn, L) (dlg).
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File [Appellants Ex Parte Request for Leave to File Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities to Opposition to Motion for Leave to File an Interlocutory Appeal] by Robert J. Harrington. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Rudolph, Gary) Modified on 8/18/2020 to send QC email re proposed order (dlg).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting re #13 Transmittal of Perfected or Unperfected Appeal, Supplement (CSD 1256, 1257, 1258), from Appellant Robert J. Harrington. Non-compliance with local rule(s), No provision for acceptance, Bankruptcy Court caption and filing. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/14/20.(dlg)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting re #12 Reply - Other, from Appellant Robert J. Harrington. Non-compliance with local rule(s), No provision for acceptance. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/14/20.(dlg)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting, from Appellee Stewart Neil Mayer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), No provision for acceptance. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document #11 is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/14/20.(dlg)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel Rejecting re #10 Bankruptcy Appellant's Reply Brief,, from Appellant Robert J. Harrington. Non-compliance with local rule(s), No provision for acceptance under Bankruptcy Rule 8004 and no request for leave to file a reply. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/14/20.(dlg)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 *** STRICKEN PER ECF 17 *** DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO "ROBERT J. HARRINGTON'S MOTIONTO STAY ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGPENDING APPEAL, Transmittal of Perfected Record on Appeal (CSD 1256), Related document: #12 Reply - Other filed by Robert J. Harrington.(Lewis, L.) Modified on 8/14/2020 (dlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2020: #1 Strike) (dlg).
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 *** STRICKEN PER ECF 16 *** REPLY - Other re #11 Response - Other [Appellants Opposition To Appellees Objection And Motion To Strike Authorities] filed by Robert J. Harrington. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Rudolph, Gary) (dlg). Modified on 8/14/2020 (dlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2020: #2 Strike) (dlg).
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 *** STRICKEN PER ECF 15 *** RESPONSE re #10 Bankruptcy Appellant's Reply Brief, Appellee's Objection & Motion To Strike New Aothorities Raised For The First Time In Reply filed by Stewart Neil Mayer. (Keehn, L) (dlg). Modified on 8/14/2020 (dlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2020: #1 Strike) (dlg).
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 *** STRICKEN PER ECF 14 *** Bankruptcy Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by Robert J. Harrington. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service [re: Appellants Reply Memorandum Of Points And Authorities To Opposition To Motion For Leave To File An Interlocutory Appeal])(Rudolph, Gary) (dlg). Modified on 8/14/2020 (dlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2020: #2 Strike) (dlg).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Joint #8 Motion Vacating Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/31/20. (dlg)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION Vacate Scheduling Order Filed July 22, 2020 as Doc 2 by Stewart Neil Mayer. (Keehn, L) qc email re proposed order (dlg).
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #3 Transmittal of Perfected or Unperfected Appeal, Supplement (CSD 1256, 1257, 1258) Opposition To Motion For Leave To Appeal filed by Stewart Neil Mayer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket, #2 Exhibit RFS Motion, #3 Exhibit Transcript)(Keehn, L) (dlg).
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 PRO HAC APPROVED: R. Alan Fryer appearing for Appellant Robert J. Harrington (no document attached) (rmc)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14230471.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Fryer, R.) (rmc).
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Robert J. Harrington of case(s) 20-cv-01376-JLS-AHG . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Rudolph, Gary) (anh).
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 Supplement to Transmittal of Appeal and/or Bankruptcy Matter (CSD 1257), Related document: #1 Statement of Election,, filed by Robert J. Harrington. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Lewis, L.)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order. The Court sets a hearing date for the purposes of this appeal from the United States Bankruptcy Court to be held before the Honorable Gonzalo P. Curiel on November 13, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/22/20.(dlg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT and Statement of Election. Bankruptcy Court case number: 17-05922-LA7. Adversary Number: 18-90015. BAP Number SC-20-1178., filed by Robert J. Harrington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Statement of Election, #3 Notice of Transfer, #4 Notice of Referral, #5 Transmittal, #6 BAP docket sheet, #7 Notice of Appeal)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1369-GPC-JLB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(jmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Stewart Neil Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Stewart Neil Mayer
Represented By: L Scott Keehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert J. Harrington
Represented By: Gary B. Rudolph
Represented By: R. Alan Fryer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?