Cavalier v. Pollard et al
Plaintiff: Robert Thomas Cavalier
Defendant: BPH Commission Grounds, Marcus Pollard and Gov. Gavin Newson
Case Number: 3:2020cv01379
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison H Goddard
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Motion to Withdraw and Dismiss Civil Action Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and Denying Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis as Moot. (ECF Nos. #2 , #6 ). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 9/10/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (dlg).
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw and Dismiss "Cavalier v. Pollard" by Robert Thomas Cavalier. (jms)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Robert Thomas Cavalier. (jms)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Robert Thomas Cavalier. (jms)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Dana M. Sabraw Accepting re #1 Complaint,, from Plaintiff Robert Thomas Cavalier. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Initial case filings (42 U.S.C. 1983 Complaint, Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, etc.) received by U.S. Mail and not properly e-filed in accordance with S.D. Cal. General Order 653A. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/21/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Thomas Cavalier. (jms)(jrd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against Marcus Pollard, BPH Commission Grounds, Gavin Newson, filed by Robert Thomas Cavalier. ($400.00 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1379-DMS-AHG. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cavalier v. Pollard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Thomas Cavalier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BPH Commission Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Pollard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gov. Gavin Newson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?