Pacific Surf Designs, Inc. v. Whitewater West Industries, Ltd..r West et al
Plaintiff: Pacific Surf Designs, Inc.
Defendant: Whitewater West Industries, Ltd., Thomas Lochtefeld, David Keim, Geoffrey Chutter, Aquatic Development Group, Inc., Marshall Myrman and Flowrider, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01464
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331ra
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Re: #21 Setting Hearing Dates and Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Defendants may file a single brief of no more than 35 pages in support of their motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6), which brief shall be due no later than October 5, 2020. Plaintiff may file a brief in opposition to the motion of no more than 35 pages, which brief will be due no later than October 19, 2020. Defendants may file a reply brief of no more than 15 pages, which brief will be due no later than October 26, 2020. The hearing on Defendants Rule 12(b)(6) motion will be held on November 2, 2020. Defendant Geoffrey Chutters separate motion under Rule 12(b)(2) shall alsobe filed no later than October 5, 2020, shall follow the same briefing schedule outlined above, and shall be heard on November 2, 2020. The briefs for this motion shall follow the page limits governed in the Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/9/2020.(mme) Modified on 9/11/2020 to reflect order grants motion #21 (mme).
August 28, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Rickeman on behalf of Aquatic Development Group, Inc., Geoffrey Chutter, Flowrider, Inc., David Keim, Thomas Lochtefeld, Marshall Myrman, Whitewater West Industries, Ltd. (Rickeman, Thomas)Attorney Thomas C. Rickeman added to party Aquatic Development Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas C. Rickeman added to party Geoffrey Chutter(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas C. Rickeman added to party Flowrider, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas C. Rickeman added to party David Keim(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas C. Rickeman added to party Thomas Lochtefeld(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas C. Rickeman added to party Marshall Myrman(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas C. Rickeman added to party Whitewater West Industries, Ltd.(pty:dft) (mme).
August 28, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Robbins on behalf of Aquatic Development Group, Inc., Geoffrey Chutter, Flowrider, Inc., David Keim, Thomas Lochtefeld, Marshall Myrman, Whitewater West Industries, Ltd. (Robbins, Joshua)Attorney Joshua M. Robbins added to party Aquatic Development Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua M. Robbins added to party Geoffrey Chutter(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua M. Robbins added to party Flowrider, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua M. Robbins added to party David Keim(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua M. Robbins added to party Thomas Lochtefeld(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua M. Robbins added to party Marshall Myrman(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua M. Robbins added to party Whitewater West Industries, Ltd.(pty:dft) (mme).
August 25, 2020 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Set Hearing Dates and Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Aquatic Development Group, Inc., Geoffrey Chutter, Flowrider, Inc., David Keim, Thomas Lochtefeld, Marshall Myrman, Whitewater West Industries, Ltd.. (Scott, Roger) *QC Mailer sent re proposed order should not be attached* (mme).
August 25, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger Leonard Scott on behalf of Aquatic Development Group, Inc., Geoffrey Chutter, Flowrider, Inc., David Keim, Thomas Lochtefeld, Marshall Myrman, Whitewater West Industries, Ltd. (Scott, Roger)Attorney Roger Leonard Scott added to party Aquatic Development Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Leonard Scott added to party Geoffrey Chutter(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Leonard Scott added to party Flowrider, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Leonard Scott added to party David Keim(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Leonard Scott added to party Thomas Lochtefeld(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Leonard Scott added to party Marshall Myrman(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Leonard Scott added to party Whitewater West Industries, Ltd.(pty:dft) (mme).
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #18 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. The Defendants shall have until September 11, 2020, to file their Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. No further continuances will be granted without just cause. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/17/2020. (mme)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Complaint by Pacific Surf Designs, Inc.. (Thomas, Joseph) (mme).
August 5, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pacific Surf Designs, Inc.. Aquatic Development Group, Inc. served. (Thomas, Joseph) (mme).
August 5, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pacific Surf Designs, Inc.. David Keim served. (Thomas, Joseph) (mme).
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jeffrey Grell, re #10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/3/2020.(rmc)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pacific Surf Designs, Inc.. Whitewater West Industries, Ltd. served. (Thomas, Joseph) (mme).
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pacific Surf Designs, Inc.. Marshall Myrman served. (Thomas, Joseph) (mme).
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pacific Surf Designs, Inc.. Thomas Lochtefeld served. (Thomas, Joseph) (mme).
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pacific Surf Designs, Inc.. Flowrider, Inc. served. (Thomas, Joseph) (mme).
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14252354.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Grell, Jeff) (rmc).
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Grant J. Thomas by Joseph Edward Thomas on behalf of Pacific Surf Designs, Inc. (Thomas, Joseph) *QC Mailer sent re user/attorney account*( (mme).
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance of Michael D. Martello by Joseph Edward Thomas on behalf of Pacific Surf Designs, Inc. (Thomas, Joseph) *QC Mailer sent re user/attorney account*( (mme).
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Travis S. Biffar by Joseph Edward Thomas on behalf of Pacific Surf Designs, Inc. (Thomas, Joseph) *QC Mailer sent re user/attorney account*( (mme).
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of William J. Kolegraff by Joseph Edward Thomas on behalf of Pacific Surf Designs, Inc. (Thomas, Joseph) *QC Mailer sent re user/attorney account*(mme).
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Joseph E. Thomas by Joseph Edward Thomas on behalf of Pacific Surf Designs, Inc. (Thomas, Joseph) (mme).
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pacific Surf Designs, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Thomas, Joseph) (mme).
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Pacific Surf Designs, Inc. of case(s) 3:17-cv-1118 and 3:15-cv-01879. (Thomas, Joseph) (mme).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjt)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Aquatic Development Group, Inc., Geoffrey Chutter, Flowrider, Inc., David Keim, Thomas Lochtefeld, Marshall Myrman, Whitewater West Industries, Ltd. West ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14241123). Filed by Pacific Surf Designs, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1464-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Thomas, Joseph)(sjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Surf Designs, Inc. v. Whitewater West Industries, Ltd..r West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Surf Designs, Inc.
Represented By: Grant Joseph Thomas
Represented By: William J Kolegraff
Represented By: Joseph Edward Thomas
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Represented By: Michael Martello
Represented By: Jeff Grell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitewater West Industries, Ltd.
Represented By: Thomas C. Rickeman
Represented By: Roger Leonard Scott
Represented By: Joshua M. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Lochtefeld
Represented By: Thomas C. Rickeman
Represented By: Roger Leonard Scott
Represented By: Joshua M. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Keim
Represented By: Thomas C. Rickeman
Represented By: Roger Leonard Scott
Represented By: Joshua M. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey Chutter
Represented By: Thomas C. Rickeman
Represented By: Roger Leonard Scott
Represented By: Joshua M. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aquatic Development Group, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas C. Rickeman
Represented By: Roger Leonard Scott
Represented By: Joshua M. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Myrman
Represented By: Thomas C. Rickeman
Represented By: Roger Leonard Scott
Represented By: Joshua M. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowrider, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas C. Rickeman
Represented By: Roger Leonard Scott
Represented By: Joshua M. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?