Santana et al v. BSI Financial Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Irma Santana and Rafael Santana
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust N.A., DOES 1 through 10 and BSI Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01577
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY - Other re #6 Response in Opposition to Motion, #4 Order Setting Briefing Schedule, In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by BSI Financial Services, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust N.A.. (Nguyen, Cuong)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Rafael Santana. (dlg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BSI Financial Services, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust N.A. re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Nguyen, Cuong) (dlg).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities : Responses due by 9/25/2020, Replies due by 10/9/2020. A hearing is set on October 23, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2D Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/26/20.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by U.S. Bank Trust N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Nguyen, Cuong) (dlg).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Fee for Civil Case Opening: $ 400, receipt number ACASDC-14357597, Paid on 8/19/2020. (no document attached) (Nguyen, Cuong)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2020-00020374-CU-OR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 DUE.), filed by BSI Financial Services, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint Included)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1577-GPC-WVG. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santana et al v. BSI Financial Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust N.A.
Represented By: Cuong M. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSI Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Cuong M. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?