Garner v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jason Elliot Garner
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv01593
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ruth Bermudez Montenegro
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405id
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (Attachments: #1 IFP Letter)[IFP Packet mailed to plaintiff's attorney](mme)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying of Fees or Costs. US Marshal shall effect service of complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 9/17/2020. (mme)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, Pursuant to General Order 707, by Jason Elliot Garner. (jmr)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Ruth Bermudez Montenegro has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff should print and complete the attached consent/declination form. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. (smd) (sjt).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jason Elliot Garner. (smd) (sjt).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, IFP Filed, filed by Jason Elliot Garner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1593-RBM. Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro is assigned to the case. (Pena, Jonathan)(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Elliot Garner
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?