Lenson v. Costco Wholesale Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Lenson
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corp. and Does 1 through 25
Case Number: 3:2020cv01598
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441pi
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Deborah Lenson Joint Rule 26 (f) Report (Curran, Susan) (tcf).
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Costco Wholesale Corp. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court (Holtz, James) (jrm).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/21/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Joint Discovery Plan due 10/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 8/26/2020.(mme)(jrd)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Costco Wholesale Corp. re #3 Jury Demand, #2 Answer to Complaint (Holtz, James) (mme).
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Costco Wholesale Corp.. (Holtz, James) (mme).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Costco Wholesale Corp..(Holtz, James) (mme).
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-02020-00020163-CU-PO-NC. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ACASDC-14348493.), filed by Costco Wholesale Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Complaint, #3 Exhibit B Summons, #4 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1598-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(rmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenson v. Costco Wholesale Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corp.
Represented By: James F Holtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lenson
Represented By: Susan Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?