Brown v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mason Brown
Defendant: DOES 1 to 20 and Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01601
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Granting #11 Joint Motion for Protective Order: The Court finds good cause to grant the parties' proposed protective order. See attached order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 09/29/2020. (jb1)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Breuer, Andrea) (mme).
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Teleconference Information Sheet. Teleconference set for 12/17/2020 at 9:30AM. (jb1)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Scheduling Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. Case Management Conference held on 9/22/2020. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 7/26/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 3/31/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/17/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 9/22/2020.(mme)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 9/22/2020, Case Management Conference held on 9/22/2020. Order to follow.(Plaintiff Attorney Kyle Joseph Scott). (Defendant Attorney Andrea Breuer). (no document attached) (jb1)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Resetting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference currently set for September 21, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. is RESET to September 22, 2020 at 9:30 a.m.. All other dates and guidelines remain as previously set. (See ECF No. #5 ). The parties are instructed to use the same dial in information at ECF No. #6 . SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 09/10/2020.(no document attached) (jb1)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Teleconference Information Sheet. Teleconference set for 09/21/2020 at 9:30AM. (jb1)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER for Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference/Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/21/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/18/2020.(mme)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Breuer, Andrea) (mme).
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Breuer, Andrea) (mme).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (smd) (sjt).
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Diego County Superior Court, case number 37-2020-00022652-CU-PO-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14350792.), filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1601-BEN-MDD. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Breuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason Brown
Represented By: Kyle Joseph Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?