Saumon v. CVS Pharmacy et al
Plaintiff: Linda Saumon
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, DOES 1 to 25 and Jacquelyn Zigmond
Case Number: 3:2020cv01602
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441pi
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by CVS Pharmacy (Sarkesians, Derik) (ag).
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference. A Joint Motion for Dismissal is due within two weeks. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by within two weeks, then a Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. A telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference is set for 1/6/2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/2/2020.(ag)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 10/2/2020. ENE/CMC not held due to settlement.(no document attached) (ajf)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference re any pre-ENE issues held on 9/28/2020(no document attached) (ajf)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Resetting Start Times of (1) Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Case Management Conference, and (3) Telephonic Status Conference. On its own motion, the Court resets the starting time of the 10/2/2020 Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference to 2:00 PM. Additionally, the starting time of the 9/28/2020 individual teleconferences with counsel is reset to 1:00 PM. All other aspects of the 8/20/2020 Order scheduling these dates and setting deadlines remain unchanged. (See Doc. No. #4 .). Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 9/21/2020.(ag)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Linda Saumon (Goldschmidt, Deon) (ag).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for (1) Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Case Management Conference, and (3) Telephonic Status Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 10/2/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Status Conference set for 9/28/2020 08:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 8/20/2020.(mme)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by CVS Pharmacy. (jmr) (jms).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by CVS Pharmacy. No Parties With Financial Interest. (jmr)(jms).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2019-00056615-CU-PO-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14358618.), filed by CVS Pharmacy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits A-D (State Court Documents))The new case number is 3:20-cv-1602-WQH-WVG. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saumon v. CVS Pharmacy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy
Represented By: Derik Andrik Sarkesians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacquelyn Zigmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Saumon
Represented By: Deon Shaun Goldschmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?