Hatton v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Diane Hatton
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation and DOES 1 to 10
Case Number: 3:2020cv01606
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jennifer L. Martinez (Martinez, Jennifer) (tcf).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Scheduling Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference was held on 9/22/2020. The magistrate judge will hold a telephonic, attorneys-only Settlement Conference on 11/4/2020 at 9:30 AM. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 12/2/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 9/22/2020. (tcf)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez: An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference was held via Zoom on 9/22/2020. The case did not settle. A Case Management Conference was held via Zoom on 9/22/2020. Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorney Jennifer L. Martinez) (Defendant Attorney Kristi Blackwell)(no document attached) (bbc)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Entering Stipulated Protective Order with Modification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 9/11/2020. (tcf)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Stipulation and Protective Order, #2 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Davenport, Terra) (tcf).
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Terra M. Davenport on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Davenport, Terra)Attorney Terra M. Davenport added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft) 020 (jpp).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. A video conference Early Neutral Evaluation (ENE) is set for 9/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. In the event the case does not settle during the ENE, the Court will conduct an Initial Case Management Conference. A Joint Discovery Plan is due filed on the CM/ECF system no later than 9/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 8/21/2020. (tcf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (jmr) (jms).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (jmr) (jms).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2020-00020788- CU-P0-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14356789.), filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits 1 - 3 (State Court Complaint), #3 Demand for Jury Trial, #4 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1606-MMA-LL. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hatton v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Hatton
Represented By: Jennifer L. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Kristi Blackwell
Represented By: Terra M. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?