Guardado et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Angel Gonzalez Guardado, Brenda Gazca and Angel Guardado
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Does 1 through 20
Case Number: 3:2020cv01668
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: John A Houston
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 Minute Order. On 10/5/2020, the Court held an Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. The case settled. (ECF No. 8 .) A Joint Motion for Dismissal shall be electronically filed on or before 12/2/2020. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by 12/2/2020, then a telephonic, counsel-only Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held on 12/4/2020 at 2:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. (tcf)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt re ECF No. #4 : Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 10/5/2020 by video conference. The case settled. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney David N. Barry) (Defendant Attorney Matthew M. Proudfoot) (Angel Guardado; Brenda Gazca; Julie Moore) (no document attached) (mjg)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: An e-mail from each side providing contact information in advance of the ENE was due to the Court no later than 9/30/2020. (ECF No. #4 .) The Court is not in receipt of an e-mail providing contact information for both Plaintiffs and counsel who will represent them at the ENE. Accordingly, no later than today, 10/2/2020, at 2:00 PM, Plaintiffs shall e-mail the Court with the contact information required by paragraph 5 of the Mandatory Directions for Zoom Video Conference Participation, which is attached to the Court's 9/1/2020 Order (ECF No. #4 ).
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Brenda Gazca, Angel Guardado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration)(Barry, David) (tcf).
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Brenda Gazca, Angel Guardado Plaintiff (Barry, David) (ag).
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; and (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. A video conference Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 10/5/2020 at 9:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE, a Case Management Conference is set for 10/5/2020, and will be held at the conclusion of the ENE. The Joint Discovery Plan is due on 9/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 9/1/2020. (tcf)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ford Motor Company. No Parties With Financial Interest. (jmr) (jms).
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (jmr) (jms).
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2020-000254S8-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14398464.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit - State Court Documents, #4 Notice of Appearance)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1668-JAH-JLB. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guardado et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Gonzalez Guardado
Represented By: David Neal Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Gazca
Represented By: David Neal Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Guardado
Represented By: David Neal Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Matthew Millard Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?