In Re Mamady B. Cisse
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank National Assoc.
Appellant: Mamady B. Cisse
In Re: Mamady Binta Cisse
Case Number: 3:2020cv01694
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION and Appellant Request for Electronic Case Filing, by Mamady B. Cisse. (jmo)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 Motion and Request for the Court Ruling on Motion for Notice ofAppeal and Statement of Election Fee Waiver Request; Motion to Allow Appellant to File Appeal Designation and Statement of Issues Despite that No Ruling on the Fee Waiver, by Mamady B. Cisse. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/19/20. (jmo)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cynthia Bashant Accepting Document: 1. Motion and Request for the Court Ruling on Motion for Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election Fee Waiver Request 2. Motion to Allow Appellant to File Appeal Designation and Statement of Issues Despite that No Ruling on the Fee Waiver, from Appellant Mamady B. Cisse. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation. Nunc Pro Tunc 10/19/20. Signed by chambers of Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/20/20. (Bankruptcy Court Case Number: 17-04821-LT13. BAP Number 1)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Cynthia Bashant Rejecting Document: Application For Permission for Electronic Filing, from In Re Mamady Binta Cisse. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.2 - Missing Proof of Service; OTHER: LR 5.1 Improper Format, incorrect court in caption This appeal was filed in the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. Appellant must therefore request electronic filing privileges in accordance with the procedures listed in this districts Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual., Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by chambers of Judge Cynthia Bashant on 10/14/20.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/14/2020: #1 Rejected document) (jmo).
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 Transmittal of Perfected Record on Appeal (CSD 1256), Related document: #1 Statement of Election, filed by Mamady B. Cisse.(Lewis, L.)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 Transmittal of Perfected Record on Appeal (CSD 1256), Related document: #1 Statement of Election, filed by Mamady B. Cisse.(Lewis, L.)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 Transmittal of Perfected Record on Appeal (CSD 1256), (Lewis, L.)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 Transmittal of Perfected Record on Appeal (CSD 1256), Related document: #1 Statement of Election, filed by Mamady B. Cisse.(Lewis, L.)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT and Statement of Election. Bankruptcy Court case number: 17-04821-LT13. BAP Number 1., filed by Mamady B. Cisse. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Referral, #3 Transmittal)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1694-BAS-WVG. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(zda)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Mamady B. Cisse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank National Assoc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mamady B. Cisse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Mamady Binta Cisse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?