Washington v. RGC Gaslamp LLC et al
Plaintiff: Willie Washington
Defendant: Nason's Beer Hall, RGC Gaslamp LLC doing business as The Pendry Hotel and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 3:2020cv01718
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) for Early Neutral Evaluation and (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are set for 12/17/2020 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. All parties and lead attorneys must appear by way of the Zoom videoconference program at the ENE. A Joint Discovery Plan is due 12/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 10/20/2020. (jdt)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RGC Gaslamp LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schulz, Peter) (jdt).
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by RGC Gaslamp LLC. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Proof of Service)(Schulz, Peter) (jdt).
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (Doc. #4 ). RGC Gaslamp LLC must respond to the Complaint on or before 10/12/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 10/1/2020. (jdt)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by RGC Gaslamp LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schulz, Peter)Attorney Peter J. Schulz added to party RGC Gaslamp LLC(pty:dft) (jdt).
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr)(jms).
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Willie Washington. No Parties With Financial Interest. (jmr)(jms).
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES 1-10, Nason's Beer Hall, RGC Gaslamp LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14436228.), filed by Willie Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-B)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1718-W-AGS. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Taibi, Michael)(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. RGC Gaslamp LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nason's Beer Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RGC Gaslamp LLC doing business as The Pendry Hotel
Represented By: Peter J. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Washington
Represented By: Michael A. Taibi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?