Cota v. Autozone, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Julissa Cota
Defendant: Does 1 to 10 and Autozone, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01797
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (AGS): In light of the notice of settlement (ECF #4 ), the Court vacates all pending dates. On December 14, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., plaintiff must provide an oral status report on the filing of the motion to dismiss. That report must be provided by telephone. Should the motion to dismiss be filed before that date, the obligation to call will be stricken without further Court Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 11/02/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Settlement by Julissa Cota (Coelho, Thiago) (mme).
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julissa Cota. Autozone, Inc. served. (Coelho, Thiago)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr)(jms).
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Autozone, Inc., Does 1 to 10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14494318.), filed by Julissa Cota. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1797-AJB-AGS. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Coelho, Thiago)(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cota v. Autozone, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julissa Cota
Represented By: Thiago M. Coelho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?