U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Ralphs Grocery Company
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Ralphs Grocery Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv01802
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Consent Decree and Order. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/21/2020. (ag) (rmc).
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Joint Motion to Approve Consent to Settlement and Order by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Liem, Connie) (ag).
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Torralba Patajo on behalf of Ralphs Grocery Company (Patajo, Emily)Attorney Emily Torralba Patajo added to party Ralphs Grocery Company(pty:dft) (ag).
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Appearance served on Ralphs Grocery Company on September 15, 2020, filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Liem, Connie) (ag).
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Connie K Liem on behalf of U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Liem, Connie)Attorney Connie K Liem added to party U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission(pty:pla) (ag).
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (jms).
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ralphs Grocery Company, No Fee Required, filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1802-WQH-MDD. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Park, Anna)(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Ralphs Grocery Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Anna Y Park
Represented By: Connie K Liem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralphs Grocery Company
Represented By: Emily Torralba Patajo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?