Kettner Investments, LLC et al v. Kriebel
Plaintiff: Kettner Investments, LLC and Stone Ash, LLC
Defendant: Marilyn Kriebel
Cross Defendant: TL-66, LLC, Does 1 through 25, James R. Arabia, John W. Huemoeller, Stuart W. Titus and Timothy R. Scott
Case Number: 3:2020cv01866
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Motion to Remand (Doc. #13 ). The time for the Administrator to file a Motion to Remand is extended to 12/23/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 11/19/2020. (jdt)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marilyn Kriebel re #13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand Case to the Superior Court for the County of San Diego, CA (Coughlin, Sean). QC email: missing title page (jdt).
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Remand Case to the Superior Court for the County of San Diego, CA by Marilyn Kriebel. (Coughlin, Sean) (jdt).
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Continuance of Defendant's Motion to Change Venue Hearing (Doc. #11 ). The hearing date for Defendant's Motion (Doc. #10 ) is continued to Monday, 1/11/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 10/26/2020. (jdt)
October 23, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Extend Hearing Date on Kettner Investments, LLC's Motion to Transfer Venue by Marilyn Kriebel. (Coughlin, Sean) (jdt).
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Change Venue /Transfer Venue by James R. Arabia, John W. Huemoeller, Kettner Investments, LLC, Timothy R. Scott, TL-66, LLC, Stuart W. Titus. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, Part 1 of 2, #5 Exhibit 2, Part 2 of 2, #6 Exhibit 3)(Smelko, William) (jdt).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to File Motion to Remand (Doc. #8 ). The Administrator must file the Motion to Remand on or before 11/23/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 10/15/2020. (jdt)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion To Remand Case To The Superior Court For The County Of San Diego, California by Marilyn Kriebel. (Coughlin, Sean). QC email: s/ by nonregistered user. No refile (jdt).
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Automatic Stay by James R. Arabia, John W. Huemoeller, Kettner Investments, LLC, Timothy R. Scott, Stone Ash, LLC, TL-66, LLC, Stuart W. Titus (Smelko, William)Attorney William A. Smelko added to party Kettner Investments, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney William A. Smelko added to party Stone Ash, LLC(pty:pla) (jdt).
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, and (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 7/1/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/2/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Joint Discovery Plan due 11/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 09/14/2020.(mme)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James R. Arabia, John W. Huemoeller, Kettner Investments, LLC, Timothy R. Scott, TL-66, LLC, Stuart W. Titus re #1 Notice of Removal,, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION (Smelko, William). QC email: all-caps text (jdt).
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TL-66, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Smelko, William) (jdt).
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kettner Investments, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Smelko, William) (jdt).
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Marilyn Kriebel. (rmc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-02018-56184-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACASDC-14540358.), filed by Timothy R. Scott, James R. Arabia, Stuart W. Titus, Does 1 through 25, John W. Huemoeller, TL-66, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B Part 1 of 2, #4 Exhibit B Part 2 of 2, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D Part 1 of 3, #7 Exhibit D Part 2 of 3, #8 Exhibit D Part 3 of 3, #9 Exhibit E)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1866-W-AGS. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(rmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kettner Investments, LLC et al v. Kriebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: TL-66, LLC
Represented By: William A. Smelko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Does 1 through 25
Represented By: William A. Smelko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: James R. Arabia
Represented By: William A. Smelko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: John W. Huemoeller
Represented By: William A. Smelko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Stuart W. Titus
Represented By: William A. Smelko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Timothy R. Scott
Represented By: William A. Smelko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kettner Investments, LLC
Represented By: Michael Robert Kiesling
Represented By: William A. Smelko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Ash, LLC
Represented By: Michael Robert Kiesling
Represented By: William A. Smelko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Kriebel
Represented By: Sean C. Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?