Lopez et al v. San Diego Family Housing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Lopez, Tobiah Lopez, Joshua Lopez, Rosalie Lopez, Isabella Haines and Robert Fisher
Defendant: San Diego Family Housing, LLC, Lincoln Military Property Management LP and DOES 1 to 50
Case Number: 3:2020cv01915
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Houston
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (AGS): Due to an unexpected change in the Court's schedule, the November 12, 2020 Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are reset to December 11, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. The joint discovery plan and ENE briefs are now due December 4, 2020. All other provisions of this Court's original ENE Order (ECF #5 ) remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 10/30/2020. (no document attached) (say)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to continue (ECF #6 ) is granted. The Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are reset to November 12, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. The joint discovery plan and ENE briefs are now due November 5, 2020. All other provisions of this Court's original ENE Order (ECF #5 ) remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 10/13/2020. (no document attached) (mxa)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Continue JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION CONFERNECE DATE by Robert Fisher, Isabella Haines, Amanda Lopez, Joshua Lopez, Rosalie Lopez, Tobiah Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Gomez, John)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation and (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are set for 10/27/2020 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. The Joint Discovery Plan is due 10/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 10/2/2020. (tcf)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Military Property Management LP. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Reyna, Kristin) (tcf).
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by San Diego Family Housing, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Reyna, Kristin) (tcf).
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Lincoln Military Property Management LP, San Diego Family Housing, LLC.(Reyna, Kristin) (tcf).
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2020-00023493-CU-PO-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14572527.), filed by Lincoln Military Property Management LP, San Diego Family Housing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court documents, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration of Kristin Reyna DeHart with exhibits 1-12, #5 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1915-JAH-AGS. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez et al v. San Diego Family Housing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Lopez
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tobiah Lopez
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Lopez
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Lopez
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabella Haines
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Fisher
Represented By: John H. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Family Housing, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Nell Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Military Property Management LP
Represented By: Kristin Nell Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?