Tedesco v. Grand Brands, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mary Tedesco
Defendant: Grand Brands, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as True Citrus or True Lemon
Case Number: 3:2020cv01928
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Todd W Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1453
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Todd W. Robinson Rejecting re #6 Answer to Complaint, from Defendant Grand Brands, Inc. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Fed. R. Civ. P. 12a Document is not timely. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties (jmr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/23/2020: #1 Rejected Document) (jmr). (jms).
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis M. Wood on behalf of Mary Tedesco (Wood, Alexis)Attorney Alexis M. Wood added to party Mary Tedesco(pty:pla) (jmr).
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grand Brands, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Lowe, Rachel) (jmr).
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 *** Stricken per #9 *** ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Grand Brands, Inc..(Lowe, Rachel)Attorney Rachel Elizabeth King Lowe added to party Grand Brands, Inc.(pty:dft) (jmr). (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/23/2020) (jmr).
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Tedesco. Grand Brands, Inc. served. (Marron, Ronald) (dlg).
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Houchin on behalf of Mary Tedesco (Houchin, Michael)Attorney Michael Houchin added to party Mary Tedesco(pty:pla) (sxa).
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kas L. Gallucci on behalf of Mary Tedesco (Gallucci, Kas)Attorney Kas L. Gallucci added to party Mary Tedesco(pty:pla) (sxa).
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (jms).
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Grand Brands, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14582942.), filed by Mary Tedesco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1928-JLB. Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt is assigned to the case. (Marron, Ronald)(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tedesco v. Grand Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Brands, Inc. a Delaware corporation doing business as True Citrus or True Lemon
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth King Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Tedesco
Represented By: Ronald Marron
Represented By: Michael Houchin
Represented By: Kas L. Gallucci
Represented By: Alexis M. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?