R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company et al v. Becerra et al
Plaintiff: Neighborhood Market Association, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, Philip Morris USA Inc., Morija, LLC doing business as Vapin' the 619, Helix Innovations LLC, John Middleton Co., U.S. Smokeless Tobacco Company LLC, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and American Snuff Company, LLC
Defendant: Xavier Becerra and Summer Stephan
Petitioner: Mental and Public Health Organizations
Amicus Curiae: Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, American Lung Association, African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council, American Medical Association, Americans for Nonsmokers Rights, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, California School Nurses Organization, Public Health Law Center, Parents Against Vaping e-cigarettes, Truth Initiative and American Academy of Pediatrics California
Case Number: 3:2020cv01990
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ruben B Brooks
Referring Judge: Larry Alan Burns
2 Judge: William V Gallo
3 Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Summer Stephan 's Notice of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint [ECF No. 1] by Summer Stephan. (Attachments: #1 Defendant Summer Stephan's Joinder in Defendant Xavier Becerra's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint [ECF No 1], #2 Proof of Service)(Heinlein, Joshua) (tcf).
December 3, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Support re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Response to Brief of Amici Curiae filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Morija, LLC, R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Geise, Steve) (tcf).
December 3, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Nascenzi, Peter) (tcf).
December 1, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Michael Heinlein on behalf of Summer Stephan (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Heinlein, Joshua)Attorney Joshua Michael Heinlein added to party Summer Stephan(pty:dft) (tcf).
December 1, 2020 Filing 34 PRO HAC APPROVED: Noel John Francisco appearing for Plaintiffs American Snuff Company, LLC, Morija, LLC, Neighborhood Market Association, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. (no document attached) (rmc)
December 1, 2020 Filing 33 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14966701.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Francisco, Noel) (rmc).
November 23, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY in Support re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by American Snuff Company, LLC, Morija, LLC, Neighborhood Market Association, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Geise, Steve) Modified text to reflect document on 11/24/2020 (tcf).
November 16, 2020 Filing 31 Brief of Amici Curiae in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council, American Academy of Pediatrics California, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, American Medical Association, Americans for Nonsmokers Rights, California School Nurses Organization, Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, Parents Against Vaping e-cigarettes, Public Health Law Center, Truth Initiative. (tcf)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting #28 Unopposed Motion by Amici Curiae to File Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Any response to the amici curiae brief SHALL BE FILED on or before 12/3/2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/16/2020. (tcf)
November 12, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendant Summer Stephan's Joinder in Defendant Xavier Becerra's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [ECF No. 6] filed by Summer Stephan. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Heinlein, Joshua) (tcf).
November 12, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Mental and Public Health Organizations. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Raphael, Jordan)Attorney Jordan Raphael added to party Mental and Public Health Organizations(pty:mov) (tcf).
November 12, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Xavier Becerra. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Nascenzi, Peter) (tcf).
November 6, 2020 Filing 26 PRO HAC APPROVED: Sarah M. Harris appearing for Plaintiffs Helix Innovations LLC, John Middleton Co., Philip Morris USA Inc., U.S. Smokeless Tobacco Company LLC (no document attached) (jrd)
November 6, 2020 Filing 25 PRO HAC APPROVED: Lisa Schiavo Blatt appearing for Plaintiffs Helix Innovations LLC, John Middleton Co., Philip Morris USA Inc., U.S. Smokeless Tobacco Company LLC (no document attached) (jrd)
November 6, 2020 Filing 24 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14825066.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Harris, Sarah)
November 6, 2020 Filing 23 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14825018.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Blatt, Lisa)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney. Plaintiffs substitute attorney David J. Noonan as counsel of record in place of attorney Tommy Huynh. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/5/2020. (tcf)
November 3, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Helix Innovations LLC, John Middleton Co., Philip Morris USA Inc., U.S. Smokeless Tobacco Company LLC re #20 Notice (Other),, filed by Philip Morris USA Inc., U.S. Smokeless Tobacco Company LLC, John Middleton Co., Helix Innovations LLC (Document No. 20). (Noonan, David) (tcf).
October 29, 2020 Filing 20 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #21 *** NOTICE Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by Helix Innovations LLC, John Middleton Co., Philip Morris USA Inc., U.S. Smokeless Tobacco Company LLC (Noonan, David)Attorney David J Noonan added to party Helix Innovations LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David J Noonan added to party John Middleton Co.(pty:pla), Attorney David J Noonan added to party Philip Morris USA Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David J Noonan added to party U.S. Smokeless Tobacco Company LLC(pty:pla) (jpp). QC mailer sent re: proposed orders not to be filed in CM/ECF, request for document to be withdrawn by attorney (tcf). Modified to withdraw document on 11/4/2020 (tcf).
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #18 Joint Motion to Consolidate Hearings and Setting Briefing Schedule. The Court HEREBY CONTINUES the hearing presently scheduled in this matter for 11/23/2020 to 12/10/2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 4D before Judge Janis L. Sammartino. The Court will hold the hearing by video, with public access by telephone. Additionally, the Court SETS the following briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #6 ): Defendants SHALL FILE an Opposition on or before 11/12/2020. Plaintiffs MAY FILE a Reply on or before 11/23/2020. And finally, the Court EXTENDS Defendants' deadline to respond to the Complaintto 12/3/2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/27/2020. (tcf)
October 26, 2020 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Consolidate Hearings by American Snuff Company, LLC, Morija, LLC, Neighborhood Market Association, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Geise, Steve) (tcf).
October 20, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc., Neighborhood Market Association, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, Morija, LLC, American Snuff Company, LLC. Xavier Becerra served. (Geise, Steve) (tcf).
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Sarah Harris, re #11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/19/2020.(rmc)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Lisa Blatt, re #12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/19/2020.(rmc)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns, Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks no longer assigned to case. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge(s) have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge(s). Create association to 3:20-cv-01124-JLS-WVG. The new case number is 20cv1990-JLS-WVG. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/16/2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 10/15/2020.(jdt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc., Neighborhood Market Association, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, Morija, LLC, American Snuff Company, LLC. Summer Stephan served. (Geise, Steve) Modified on 10/19/2020 to reflect service was executed on 10/13/2020 per support staff/call. (jrd).
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14678740.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Blatt, Lisa)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14669474.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Harris, Sarah) (rmc).
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 PRO HAC APPROVED: Andrew Bentz, Christian Vergonis, Ryan Jeffrey Watson appearing for Plaintiffs American Snuff Company, LLC, Morija, LLC, Neighborhood Market Association, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. (no document attached) (rmc)
October 12, 2020 Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14666391.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Bentz, Andrew) (rmc).
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14666369.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Watson, Ryan) (rmc).
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14666333.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Vergonis, Christian) (rmc).
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by American Snuff Company, LLC, Morija, LLC, Neighborhood Market Association, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Statutory Addendum, #3 Declaration of Huckabee, #4 Declaration of Canary-Garner, #5 Declaration of Yager, #6 Declaration of Winch, #7 Declaration of Sylvester, #8 Declaration of Somo)(Geise, Steve) (jdt).
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Helix Innovations LLC, John Middleton Co., Philip Morris USA Inc., U.S. Smokeless Tobacco Company LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent Philip Morris USA Inc. for John Middleton Co.; Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Philip Morris USA Inc.; Other Affiliate Altria Enterprises II LLC, Other Affiliate Zebra IV AG for Helix Innovations LLC; Corporate Parent Altria Enterprises II LLC for U.S. Smokeless Tobacco Company LLC. (Huynh, Tommy) (jdt).
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by American Snuff Company, LLC, Morija, LLC, Neighborhood Market Association, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. of case(s) 3:20-cv-01290-JLS-WVG; 3:20-cv-01124-JLS-WVG . (Geise, Steve) (jdt).
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by American Snuff Company, LLC, Morija, LLC, Neighborhood Market Association, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Reynolds American Inc., Corporate Parent British American Tobacco, p.l.c., Corporate Parent RAI Innovations Company for R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company; Corporate Parent Reynolds American Inc., Corporate Parent British American Tobacco, p.l.c. for American Snuff Company, LLC, R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. (Geise, Steve) (jdt).
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (vxc) (dsn)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14657798.), filed by John Middleton Co., R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc., Philip Morris USA Inc., Neighborhood Market Associatio, Inc., Helix Innovations LLC, R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, Morija, LLC, U.S. Smokeless Tobacco Company LLC, American Snuff Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1990-LAB-RBB. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Geise, Steve)(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company et al v. Becerra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Peter F. Nascenzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Stephan
Represented By: Joshua Michael Heinlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neighborhood Market Association, Inc.
Represented By: Steve N. Geise
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Noel John Francisco
Represented By: Andrew Bentz
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company
Represented By: Steve N. Geise
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Noel John Francisco
Represented By: Andrew Bentz
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Morris USA Inc.
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: David J Noonan
Represented By: Sarah M. Harris
Represented By: Lisa Schiavo Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morija, LLC doing business as Vapin' the 619
Represented By: Steve N. Geise
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Noel John Francisco
Represented By: Andrew Bentz
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helix Innovations LLC
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: David J Noonan
Represented By: Sarah M. Harris
Represented By: Lisa Schiavo Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Middleton Co.
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: David J Noonan
Represented By: Sarah M. Harris
Represented By: Lisa Schiavo Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Smokeless Tobacco Company LLC
Represented By: Tommy Huynh
Represented By: David J Noonan
Represented By: Sarah M. Harris
Represented By: Lisa Schiavo Blatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.
Represented By: Steve N. Geise
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Noel John Francisco
Represented By: Andrew Bentz
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company
Represented By: Steve N. Geise
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Noel John Francisco
Represented By: Andrew Bentz
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Snuff Company, LLC
Represented By: Steve N. Geise
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Noel John Francisco
Represented By: Andrew Bentz
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mental and Public Health Organizations
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Lung Association
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Medical Association
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Americans for Nonsmokers Rights
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Heart Association
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California School Nurses Organization
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Health Law Center
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Parents Against Vaping e-cigarettes
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Truth Initiative
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Pediatrics California
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?