Scherer et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Scherer and Lucas Scherer
Defendant: Bob Baker Jeep Chrysler Dodge Ram Fiat, Does 1 Through 10 and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv02009
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 pl Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Attorney's Fees (Doc. No. #133 ). The Court grants the parties' joint motion and awards the amount of $13,165.00 for attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses in favor of Plaintiffs. The Motion for Attorney's Fees (Doc. No. 131) is denied as moot and the motion hearing set for 3/2/2023 is vacated pursuant to the terms of the parties Joint Stipulation. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/29/2022. (jrm)
December 8, 2022 Filing 133 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees /Joint Stipulation Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees Re Motion to Retax Costs and Related Matters and Request for Entry of Order by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Dolin, Tionna)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #131 MOTION for Attorney Fees : Responses due by 11/29/2022; Replies due by 12/6/2022; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2023 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (sc)
November 7, 2022 Filing 131 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Fee Motion, #2 Declaration of Tionna Dolin in Support of Fee Motion, #3 Declaration of Dara Tabesh in Support of Fee Motion and Exhibit A)(Tabesh, Dara) (jrm).
November 7, 2022 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Zavig Mkrdech on behalf of Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Mkrdech, Zavig)Attorney Zavig Mkrdech added to party Amanda Scherer(pty:pla), Attorney Zavig Mkrdech added to party Lucas Scherer(pty:pla)(jrm).
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Order: (1) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees; and (2) Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Retax Costs (Doc. Nos. #75 , #122 ). the Court orders: 1. Plaintiffs' motion for fees in granted in part and denied in part in the modified amount of $378,960.13; and 2. Plaintiffs' motion to retax costs is granted in part and denied in part in the modified amount of $62,159.36. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/24/2022. (jrm)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Seal (Doc No. #124 ). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/19/2022. (jrm)
October 18, 2022 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #122 MOTION for Taxation of Costs filed by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dara Tabesh in Support of Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Retax Costs, #2 Exhibit 1 to Tabesh Declaration)(Tabesh, Dara)(jrm).
October 11, 2022 Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re #122 MOTION for Taxation of Costs filed by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg) (jrm).
October 7, 2022 Filing 124 RESPONSE in Support re #118 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, #76 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Hendler iso Joint Mtn to File Under Seal, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #122 MOTION for Taxation of Costs : Responses due by 10/11/2022; Replies due by 10/18/2022; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2023 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (sc)
September 23, 2022 Filing 122 MOTION for Taxation of Costs by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Retax Costs)(Tabesh, Dara)(jrm).
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Denying Joint Motion to Seal (Doc. No. #118 ). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/22/2022. (jrm)
September 16, 2022 Filing 120 Costs Taxed in amount of $15,496.80 against FCA US, LLC. (sjt)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA, Motions Submitted #118 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. This motion is suitable for determination on the papers and without need for oral argument, pursuant to CivLR 7.1.d.1. Accordingly, no appearances are required and this motion is deemed submitted as of this date. (no document attached) (sc)
September 12, 2022 Filing 118 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Tabesh, Dara) QC mailer sent re missing sealed lodged proposed documents on 9/13/2022 (jrm).
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA, Motions Submitted #74 #75 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court finds this motion suitable for determination on the papers and without need for oral argument pursuant to Civ.LR 7.1.d.1. Accordingly, no appearances are required and this motion is deemed submitted as of this date.(no document attached) (sc)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting re #101 Notice (Other), from Defendant FCA US, LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(h): Includes a proposed order or requires judges signature. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/8/2022.(jrm) Modified docket text on 8/9/2022 (jrm).
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal (Doc. No. #76 ). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/8/2022. (jrm)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting re #111 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, from Plaintiffs Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ.L. Rule 5.1 - Time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation not received from chambers. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/5/2022.(jrm)
August 5, 2022 Filing 113 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer re #111 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer Withdrawal of Docket No. 111-2 (Proposed Order). (Tabesh, Dara) (jrm).
August 4, 2022 Filing 112 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #111 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Tabesh, Dara) (jrm).
August 4, 2022 Filing 111 ***Document Stricken per Order #114 *** MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Tabesh, Dara) (jrm). Modified to strike on 8/5/2022 (jrm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2022: #3 Stricken Document Form) (jrm).
August 4, 2022 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Tionna Dolin on behalf of Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Dolin, Tionna)(jrm).
August 4, 2022 Filing 109 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Dolin, Tionna)(jrm).
August 4, 2022 Filing 108 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Dolin, Tionna) (jrm).
August 4, 2022 Filing 107 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Dolin, Tionna) (jrm).
August 4, 2022 Filing 106 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Dolin, Tionna)(jrm).
August 3, 2022 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) QC Mailer sent re incorrect signature on 8/4/2022; WITHDRAW/REFILE(jrm).
August 3, 2022 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Ali Azemoon on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)Attorney Ali Azemoon added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft)(jrm).
August 3, 2022 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Hailey Marie Rogerson on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)Attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft (jrm).
August 3, 2022 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Greg Gruzman on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg)Attorney Greg Gruzman added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft) QC Mailer sent re incorrect signature on 8/4/2022; WITHDRAW/REFILE (jrm).
August 2, 2022 Filing 101 NOTICE Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by FCA US, LLC (Stuhlbarg, Richard)(jrm).
July 26, 2022 Filing 100 NOTICE of Disassociation of Counsel for Plaintiff by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Dolin, Tionna)(jrm).
July 25, 2022 Filing 99 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Plaintiffs Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer re #79 Bill of Costs, . (Tabesh, Dara)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting re #90 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, from Plaintiff Lucas Scherer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/14/2022.(jrm)
July 14, 2022 Filing 97 RESPONSE to Motion re #90 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal filed by FCA US, LLC. (Reynolds, Bryan)(jrm).
July 14, 2022 Filing 96 DECLARATION re #92 Reply to Response to Motion, Supplemental Declaration of Payam Shahian in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Expenses by Plaintiffs Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Tabesh, Dara) (jrm).
July 14, 2022 Filing 95 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #90 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Tabesh, Dara)
July 14, 2022 Filing 94 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer re #91 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #92 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer Re Docket Nos. 91 and 92-1. (Tabesh, Dara) (jrm).
July 14, 2022 Filing 93 Objection to Bill of Costs re #79 Bill of Costs, filed by FCA US, LLC. (Reynolds, Bryan)(jrm).
July 13, 2022 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion re #75 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Payam Shahian (Supplemental) and Exhibits A-K)(Tabesh, Dara) (jrm).
July 13, 2022 Filing 91 ***Document withdrawn per Doc. #94 ** SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #90 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Tabesh, Dara) Modified to withdraw on 7/14/2022 (jrm).
July 13, 2022 Filing 90 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Tabesh, Dara)
July 6, 2022 Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re #75 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees, #74 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" TO DECLARATION OF RICHARD L. STUHLBARG, #2 Exhibit "B" TO DECLARATION OF RICHARD L. STUHLBARG, #3 Exhibit "C" TO DECLARATION OF RICHARD L. STUHLBARG, #4 Exhibit "D" TO DECLARATION OF RICHARD L. STUHLBARG, #5 Declaration DECLARATION OF MICHAEL DRONE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FCA US LLC'S OPPOSITION)(Reynolds, Bryan) (jpp).
July 1, 2022 Filing 88 NOTICE of Hearing - Bill of Costs, re #79 Bill of Costs, filed by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer : Hearing set for 7/19/2022 at 11:00AM. Any opposition or responsive pleading due 7/14/2022. All parties requesting to appear telephonically for this Bill of Costs hearing are directed to join on a conference call, then contact S. Tweedle 619-557-7349 at the time of the hearing. (no document attached) (sjt)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application under Rule 6(B) for Relief from Late Filing of Documents from Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Expenses (Doc. No. #81 ). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/27/2022. (jrm)
June 23, 2022 Filing 86 DECLARATION re #75 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees Amended Declaration of Payam Shahian in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Expenses (Amended version of Docket No. 75-1) by Plaintiffs Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Tabesh, Dara) (jrm).
June 23, 2022 Filing 85 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer re #75 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer Withdrawal of Docket No. 75-1. (Tabesh, Dara) (jrm).
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting re #80 Notice (Other),, from Plaintiffs Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. Non-compliance with local rule(s), No provision for acceptance. Erratas prohibited. CivLR 15.1.a. Amended Pleadings. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 6/23/2022.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm)
June 23, 2022 Filing 83 NOTICE of Hearing - Bill of Costs, re #79 Bill of Costs, filed by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer : Hearing set for 7/12/2022 at 11:00AM is hereby VACATED as Bill of Costs was not filed timely as required under L.R.54.1.a. The Clerk may be reset hearing pending resolution of #81 Motion to Deem Timely Filed Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs. (no document attached) (sjt)
June 23, 2022 Filing 82 NOTICE of Hearing - Bill of Costs, re #79 Bill of Costs, filed by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer : Hearing set for 7/12/2022 at 11:00AM. Any opposition or responsive pleading due 7/7/2022. All parties requesting to appear telephonically for this Bill of Costs hearing are directed to join on a conference call, then contact S. Tweedle 619-557-7349 at the time of the hearing. (no document attached) (sjt)
June 22, 2022 Filing 81 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File and/or to Deem Timely Filed Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs and Supporting Documents to Fee Motion by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Payam Shahian in Support of Ex Parte Application, #2 Exhibit 1 to Shahian Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Tabesh, Dara) (jrm).
June 22, 2022 Filing 80 ***Document stricken per Order #84 *** NOTICE of Errata by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer re #75 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Amended Declaration of Payam Shahian in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Expenses))(Tabesh, Dara)(jrm). Modified to strike on 6/23/2022 (jrm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2022: #2 Stricken Document Form) (jrm).
June 22, 2022 Filing 79 BILL OF COSTS submitted Notice of When Clerk Will Hear Application for Bill of Costs by Plaintiffs Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer in the amount of $ 72076.83. Hearing set for 7/12/2022 at 11:00AM. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tionna Dolin and Exhibits 1-14, #2 Bill of Costs)(Tabesh, Dara)(jrm).
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #75 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees, #76 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal, #74 MOTION for Attorney Fees : Responses due by 7/6/2022; Replies due by 7/13/2022; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2022 at 9:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
June 22, 2022 Filing 77 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #76 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Tabesh, Dara) (fth).
June 22, 2022 Filing 76 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Tabesh, Dara) (fth).
June 22, 2022 Filing 75 MOTION for Attorney Fees Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Payam Shahian in Support of Fee Motion and Exhibits 1-32, #2 Declaration of Marshall Cole and Vikram Sohal in Support of Fee Motion, #3 Exhibit 1 to Cole and Sohal Declaratioon, #4 Exhibit 2 to Cole and Sohal Declaratioon)(Tabesh, Dara)(jrm).
June 21, 2022 Filing 74 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dara Tabesh [Public], #2 Declaration of Tionna Dolin)(Tabesh, Dara)
June 7, 2022 Filing 73 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in accordance with the terms of the accepted Offer of Judgment.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm)
June 6, 2022 Filing 72 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Clark, Jason)(jrm).
June 6, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE to Withdraw Docket Entry No. 69 by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer re #69 Request for Entry of Clerk Default Judgment (Clark, Jason)(jrm).
June 6, 2022 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Patrick Clark on behalf of Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Clark, Jason)Attorney Jason Patrick Clark added to party Amanda Scherer(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Patrick Clark added to party Lucas Scherer(pty:pla) (jrm).
June 2, 2022 Filing 69 Request for Entry of Clerk Default Judgment against FCA US LLC. (Dolin, Tionna) QC mailer sent re incorrect event and missing attachments on 6/3/2022; withdraw/refile (jrm).
February 23, 2022 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Zoom Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 2/17/2022. Case did not settle. (Plaintiff Attorney Tionna Dolin, Marshal Cole). (Defendant Attorney Richard L. Stuhlbarg, Spencer Peter Hugret). (no document attached) (djg)
February 9, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Sohal, Vikram)Attorney Vikram Sohal added to party Amanda Scherer(pty:pla), Attorney Vikram Sohal added to party Lucas Scherer(pty:pla)(jrm).
February 7, 2022 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Christine J. Haw on behalf of Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Haw, Christine)Attorney Christine J. Haw added to party Amanda Scherer(pty:pla), Attorney Christine J. Haw added to party Lucas Scherer(pty:pla)(jrm).
January 29, 2022 Filing 65 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tionna Dolin (Dolin, Tionna)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting in Part Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines (ECF No. #63 ) Mandatory Settlement Conference continued to 2/17/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 1/18/2022. (jrm)
January 12, 2022 Filing 63 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Schedule deadlines by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Tabesh, Dara)(jrm).
January 6, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle J. Correll on behalf of Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Correll, Michelle)Attorney Michelle J. Correll added to party Amanda Scherer(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle J. Correll added to party Lucas Scherer(pty:pla) (jrm).
December 20, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft) (jmo).
December 15, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Law, Daniel)Attorney Daniel Law added to party Amanda Scherer(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel Law added to party Lucas Scherer(pty:pla) QC Mailer sent re incorrect signature on 12/16/2021; WITHDRAW/REFILE (jrm).
December 7, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Karin Nelson Kuemerle on behalf of Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Kuemerle, Karin)Attorney Karin Nelson Kuemerle added to party Amanda Scherer(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Nelson Kuemerle added to party Lucas Scherer(pty:pla) (jrm).
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Re: Joint Discovery Statement #41 , #57 . The Plaintiffs Motion to Compel #41 is DENIED as moot. Defendant is ordered to produce to Plaintiffs by December 3, 2021 all of the RFP discovery ordered in this Order, as well as all of the discovery Defendant represented it was going to produce, including the required privilege logs. Defendant is ordered to supplement its responses to Plaintiffs Special Interrogatories Nos. 11, 12, and 14-19 by December 10, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/23/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(zda)
November 2, 2021 Filing 57 STATUS REPORT Joint Discovery Statement by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Tabesh, Dara) (jrm).
November 2, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE to Withdrawal an Attorney From The Docket by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Dolin, Tionna)(jrm).
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Modified Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/1/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting in Part Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines (ECF No. #52 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/1/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm)
October 28, 2021 Filing 53 Joint MOTION for Protective Order to Include Moran Production Personal Identifiable Information by FCA US, LLC. (Stuhlbarg, Richard)
October 28, 2021 Filing 52 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Discovery Statement by FCA US, LLC. (Stuhlbarg, Richard)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting in Part Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines (ECF No. #50 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/12/2021. (jrm)
October 7, 2021 Filing 50 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline to File Joint Discovery Report and Motions to Compel by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Tabesh, Dara) (jrm).
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Denying Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/4/2021. (jrm)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines (ECF No. #14 ). Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 2/2/2022 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Pretrial Order due by 9/21/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/29/2021. (jrm)
September 28, 2021 Filing 47 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Order and Other Case Deadline by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Tabesh, Dara) (jrm).
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Requiring Counsel to Meet and Confer and Setting Additional Discovery Procedures. (ECF No. #44 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/10/2021. (jrm)
September 9, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Stuhlbarg on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Stuhlbarg, Richard)Attorney Richard L. Stuhlbarg added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft)(jrm).
September 8, 2021 Filing 44 Ex Parte MOTION To Continue Briefing Schedule Re Opposition And Reply To Plaintiffs Motion To Compel Compliance re #42 Order Setting Briefing Schedule by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO Ex Parte, #2 Declaration of Bryan A. Reynolds ISO Ex Parte)(Reynolds, Bryan)(jrm).
September 7, 2021 Filing 43 REPLY - Other re #41 MOTION for Sanctions for Compliance With Discovery Order and for Prospective Sanctions filed by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Tabesh, Dara) (jrm).
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Defendants must file any opposition by 8/30/2021; and Plaintiffs may file a reply by 9/7/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/23/2021.(jrm)
August 22, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Sanctions for Compliance With Discovery Order and for Prospective Sanctions by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Dara Tabesh and Exhibits 1-18, #3 Request for Judicial Notice and RJN Exhibits 1-3)(Tabesh, Dara)(jrm).
August 9, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Andrew Reynolds on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Reynolds, Bryan)Attorney Bryan Andrew Reynolds added to party FCA US, LLC(pty:dft)(jrm).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 12/1/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Pretrial Order due by 7/21/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/13/2021. (jrm)
July 13, 2021 Filing 38 Joint MOTION to Continue Discovery and Other Case Schedule Deadlines and Enter Joint Stipulation by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Tabesh, Dara)(jrm).
June 3, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Harjap Singh Malik on behalf of Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Malik, Harjap)Attorney Harjap Singh Malik added to party Amanda Scherer(pty:pla), Attorney Harjap Singh Malik added to party Lucas Scherer(pty:pla) (jmr).
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/26/2021. (jrm)
May 25, 2021 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by FCA US, LLC. (Hernandez, Monica)(jrm).
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/12/2021. (jrm)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA, Motions Submitted #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(c). This motion is suitable for determination on the papers and without need for oral argument pursuant to CivLR 7.1.d.1. Accordingly, no appearances are required and this motion is deemed submitted as of this date.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
April 19, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Support re #27 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents, Set One, and Interrogatories, Set One Response to Objections by Defendant to Declaration of Darrel Blasjo in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Tabesh, Dara) (jrm).
April 19, 2021 Filing 31 OBJECTION by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer re #28 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,, Objections to Hernandez Declaration and Memorandum re Motion to Compel. (Tabesh, Dara) (jrm).
April 19, 2021 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer re #27 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents, Set One, and Interrogatories, Set One Supplemental RJN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Supplemental RJN, #2 Exhibit 2 to Supplemental RJN, #3 Exhibit 3 to Supplemental RJN, #4 Exhibit 4 to Supplemental RJN)(Tabesh, Dara) (jrm).
April 15, 2021 Filing 29 OBJECTION by FCA US, LLC to Declaration of Darrell Blasjo In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Production of Documents, Set One and Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Set One (Hernandez, Monica) (jrm).
April 15, 2021 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents, Set One, and Interrogatories, Set One filed by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monica Y. Hernandez in Support of Defendant FCA US LLC's Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Oppsoition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Production of Documents, Set one and Plaintiffs' Interrogatories, Set one, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Hernandez, Monica) (jrm).
April 8, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiffs Requests for Production of Documents, Set One, and Interrogatories, Set One by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Plaintiff's Expert Darrel Blasjo, #4 Exhibit 1 to Blasjo Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Blasjo Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 to Blasjo Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 to Blasjo Declaration, #8 Exhibit 5 to Blasjo Declaration, #9 Exhibit 6 to Blasjo Declaration, #10 Exhibit 7 to Blasjo Declaration, #11 Exhibit 8 to Blasjo Declaration, #12 Exhibit 9 to Blasjo Declaration, #13 Exhibit 10 to Blasjo Declaration, #14 Declaration of Dara Tabesh, #15 Exhibit 1 to Tabesh Declaration, #16 Exhibit 2 to Tabesh Declaration, #17 Exhibit 3 to Tabesh Declaration, #18 Exhibit 4 to Tabesh Declaration, #19 Exhibit 5 to Tabesh Declaration, #20 Exhibit 6 to Tabesh Declaration, #21 Exhibit 7 to Tabesh Declaration, #22 Exhibit 8 to Tabesh Declaration, #23 Exhibit 9 to Tabesh Declaration)(Tabesh, Dara)(jrm).
April 7, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY - Other re #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(c) filed by FCA US, LLC. (Hernandez, Monica) (jpp).
April 2, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by FCA US, LLC . Identifying Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate FCA Holdco B.V., Other Affiliate Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. for FCA US, LLC. (Hernandez, Monica)(jrm).
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: (1) Setting Briefing Schedule; and (2) Denying Joint Motion to Continue Deadline for Plaintiffs to File Motions to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents (ECF No. #22 ). Plaintiff must file a motion to compel by 4/8/2021; and Defendant must file any opposition by 4/15/2021. Each brief must not exceed 10 pages in length. Upon completion of the briefing, the Court will take the matter under submission pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d) and no personal appearances will be required. The parties are reminded that all deadlines will remain as previously set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 4/1/2021. (jrm)
March 31, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(c) filed by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1 to RJN)(Tabesh, Dara)(jrm).
March 29, 2021 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline for Plaintiffs to File Motions to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by FCA US, LLC. (Hernandez, Monica) (jrm).
March 22, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Payam Shahian on behalf of Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Shahian, Payam)Attorney Payam Shahian added to party Amanda Scherer(pty:pla), Attorney Payam Shahian added to party Lucas Scherer(pty:pla) (jrm).
March 17, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance Of Counsel by Regina Lotardo on behalf of Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Lotardo, Regina)Attorney Regina Lotardo added to party Amanda Scherer(pty:pla), Attorney Regina Lotardo added to party Lucas Scherer(pty:pla) (jrm).
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER By Judge Battaglia: Setting Briefing Schedule re #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(c) : Responses due by 3/31/2021, Replies due by 4/7/2021, sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (sc)
March 16, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel, Regina Lotardo by Tionna Dolin on behalf of Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Dolin, Tionna) (jrm).
March 16, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(c) by FCA US, LLC. (Hernandez, Monica) (jrm).
March 5, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Dara Tabesh on behalf of Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Tabesh, Dara)Attorney Dara Tabesh added to party Amanda Scherer(pty:pla), Attorney Dara Tabesh added to party Lucas Scherer(pty:pla)(jrm).
January 25, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by FCA US, LLC re #2 Notice of Party With Financial Interest Amended. No Parties With Financial Interest. (Hernandez, Monica) (jrm).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings: Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 9/13/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/5/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/11/2020.(jrm)
December 11, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Zoom Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 12/11/2020, Zoom Case Management Conference held on 12/11/2020. Case did not settle. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Anh Nguyen). (Defendant Attorney Richard L. Stuhlbarg). (no document attached) (err)
December 7, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Lucas Scherer, Amanda Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Second Amended Complaint) (Dolin, Tionna) (jrm).
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/7/2020. (jrm)
December 4, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Dolin, Tionna)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute Order by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: The Case Management Conference is HEREBY RESET to December 11, 2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. All other guidelines and requirements remain as previously set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/30/20. (err)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Joint Stipulation to Continue November 16, 2020 Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference continued to December 11, 2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. All other guidelines and requirements remain as previously set. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/13/2020.(jcj)
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nguyen, Anh) (jrm).
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Anh Nguyen on behalf of Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Nguyen, Anh)Attorney Anh Nguyen added to party Amanda Scherer(pty:pla), Attorney Anh Nguyen added to party Lucas Scherer(pty:pla) (jrm).
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Amanda Scherer, Lucas Scherer (Dolin, Tionna)(jrm).
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference Via Videoconference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/14/2020.(jrm)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by FCA US, LLC. (jmr) (jms).
October 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by FCA US, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate FCA North American Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate FCA Holdco B.V., Other Affiliate Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N. V. for FCA US, LLC. (jmr) (jms).
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2020-00029635-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14673745.), filed by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Monica Y Hernandez in Support of FCA US LLCs Notice of Removal with exhibits A-K, #3 State Court Complaint)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2009-AJB-BLM. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scherer et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Baker Jeep Chrysler Dodge Ram Fiat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Monica Yee Hernandez
Represented By: Bryan Andrew Reynolds
Represented By: Richard L. Stuhlbarg
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Bryan A. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Scherer
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Anh Nguyen
Represented By: Daniel Law
Represented By: Harjap Singh Malik
Represented By: Karin Nelson Kuemerle
Represented By: Payam Shahian
Represented By: Regina Lotardo
Represented By: Anh X. Nguyen
Represented By: Christine J. Haw
Represented By: Dara Tabesh
Represented By: Michelle J. Correll
Represented By: Vikram Sohal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Scherer
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Anh Nguyen
Represented By: Daniel Law
Represented By: Harjap Singh Malik
Represented By: Karin Nelson Kuemerle
Represented By: Payam Shahian
Represented By: Regina Lotardo
Represented By: Anh X. Nguyen
Represented By: Christine J. Haw
Represented By: Dara Tabesh
Represented By: Michelle J. Correll
Represented By: Vikram Sohal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?