John Wesley Noble v. Josie Gastelo
Petitioner: John Wesley Noble
Respondent: Warden Josie Gastelo
Case Number: 3:2020cv02020
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Daniel E Butcher
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (no document attached) (jms)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-09120. Original file received electronically
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (see document for details). Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2020.]
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver,(Filing fee due), filed by petitioner John Wesley Noble. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 10/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Wesley Noble v. Josie Gastelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Josie Gastelo
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Wesley Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?