Stratton v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Maureen Stratton
Defendant: Gartner, Inc. Group Insurance Plan and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2020cv02037
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying as Moot #9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to File Response to Complaint. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/18/2020. (tcf)
November 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Gartner, Inc. Group Insurance Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Green, Horace)Attorney Horace W. Green added to party Gartner, Inc. Group Insurance Plan(pty:dft) (tcf).
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to File Response to Complaint. Gartner, Inc. Group Insurance Plan and Life Insurance Company of North America SHALL RESPOND to Plaintiff Maureen Stratton's Complaint on or before 12/16/2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/12/2020. (tcf)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Gartner, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shea, Edith)Attorney Edith Sanchez Shea added to party Gartner, Inc. Group Insurance Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Edith Sanchez Shea added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) (tcf).
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maureen Stratton. Life Insurance Company of North America served. (Chandler, Corinne) (tcf).
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maureen Stratton. Gartner, Inc. Group Insurance Plan served. (Chandler, Corinne) (tcf).
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Corinne Chandler on behalf of Maureen Stratton (Chandler, Corinne)Attorney Corinne Chandler added to party Maureen Stratton(pty:pla) (tcf).
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (sjt).
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Maureen Stratton. No Parties With Financial Interest. (smd) (sjt).
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gartner, Inc. Group Insurance Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14691781.), filed by Maureen Stratton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2037-JLS-NLS. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Kantor, Andrew)(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stratton v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gartner, Inc. Group Insurance Plan
Represented By: Horace W. Green
Represented By: Edith Sanchez Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Edith Sanchez Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen Stratton
Represented By: Andrew Michael Kantor
Represented By: Corinne Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?