Tomilson v. Phytomer Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Tomilson
Defendant: Phytomer Corporation and Does 1-15
Cross Defendant: Roes 1-10 and Codif International doing business as Laboratories Phytomer
Case Number: 3:2020cv02143
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 pi
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jessica Elizabeth Lehr (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Lehr, Jessica) (sjt).
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE AND ORDER for Video Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Video Case Management Conference; and Telephonic Pre-Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/09/2020.(djk)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Following Telephonic Joint Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/07/2020.(djk)
December 7, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Telephonic Joint Status Conference held on 12/7/2020.(no document attached) (djk)
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan T. Nager on behalf of Phytomer Corporation (Nager, Jordan)Attorney Jordan T. Nager added to party Phytomer Corporation(pty:dft) (sjt).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Telephonic Joint Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/30/2020.(djk)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT Regarding Service of Cross-Defendant Codif International by Phytomer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cercos, Theodore) (sjt).
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 11/12/2020.(djk)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issuedon a Crossclaim. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjt)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 CROSSCLAIM against Codif International dba Laboratoires Phytomer, filed by Phytomer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)New Summons Requested. (Cercos, Theodore) (sjt).
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Phytomer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cercos, Theodore) (sjt).
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Phytomer Corporation. No Parties With Financial Interest. (mcb)(jrd)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Phytomer Corporation. (mcb)(jrd)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand From Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2020-00033126-CU-PL-NC. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number ACASDC-14796027.), filed by Phytomer Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Declaration of Theodore R. Cercos, #4 Declaration of Lenette Casper)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2143-JM-WVG. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(mcb)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomilson v. Phytomer Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phytomer Corporation
Represented By: Theodore R Cercos
Represented By: Jordan T. Nager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Tomilson
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Lehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Roes 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Codif International doing business as Laboratories Phytomer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?