Murtomaki v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Andrew Murtomaki
Defendant: Target Corporation and Does 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2020cv02178
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and other Pre-Trial Proceedings.Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 1/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/7/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 12/18/2020.(jmr)(jms).
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez: An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference was held via Zoom on 12/18/2020. The case did not settle. A Case Management Conference was held via Zoom on 12/18/2020. Order to issue. (Plaintiff's Attorneys Andy Van Le and Ashton Farr) (Defendant's Attorney Peter J. Schulz) (no document attached) (bbc)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schulz, Peter) (tcf).
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing in State Court by Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schulz, Peter) (mme).
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/18/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Joint Discovery Plan due 12/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 11/10/2020.(mme)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (smd) (sjt).
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Target Corporation. (smd) (sjt).
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Target Corporation. (smd) (sjt).
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2020-00027991-CU-PO-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14824463.), filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit A - state court complaint, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2178-BEN-LL. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murtomaki v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Peter J. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Murtomaki
Represented By: Andy Van Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?