Renna et al
Plaintiff: Laura Schwartz, Danielle Jaymes, Darin Prince, Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Justin Smith, Ryan Peterson, John Klier, Michael Schwartz, Cheryl Prince, Hannah Spousta, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Richard Bailey, John Phillips, Lana Rae Renna, PWGG, L.P., Second Amendment Foundation, North County Shooting Center, Inc., San Diego County Gun Owners PAC, Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms, Robert Macomber and Clint Freeman
Defendant: Xavier Becerra and Luis Lopez
Case Number: 3:2020cv02190
Filed: November 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Daniel E Butcher
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(mme)
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against All Defendants, filed by San Diego County Gun Owners PAC, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Richard Bailey, Cheryl Prince, Laura Schwartz, John Phillips, Lana Rae Renna, John Klier, Ryan Peterson, North County Shooting Center, Inc., Darin Prince, Second Amendment Foundation, Danielle Jaymes, Michael Schwartz, Justin Smith, Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms, PWGG, L.P., Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Hannah Spousta, Robert Macomber, Clint Freeman.New Summons Requested. (DiGuiseppe, Raymond) (mme).
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance Notice of Appearance by Gabrielle D. Boutin on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Luis Lopez (Boutin, Gabrielle)Attorney Gabrielle D. Boutin added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle D. Boutin added to party Luis Lopez(pty:dft) (mme).
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/22/2020. (Plaintiff Attorney Raymond DiGuiseppe, Michael Sousa). (Defendant Attorney Gabrielle Boutin). (no document attached) (jak)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Following Status Conference. Plaintiffs may file a First Amended Complaint on or before January 4, 2021. Defendants shall file any motion to dismiss on or before January 25, 2021. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition to the motion to dismiss on or before February 15, 2021. Defendants shall file any reply on or before March 1, 2021. Following completion of the briefing, the Court will set a hearing date accordingly. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/22/2020.(mme)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P Sousa on behalf of Richard Bailey, Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Danielle Jaymes, John Klier, North County Shooting Center, Inc., PWGG, L.P., Ryan Peterson, John Phillips, Cheryl Prince, Darin Prince, Lana Rae Renna, San Diego County Gun Owners PAC, Laura Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, Second Amendment Foundation, Justin Smith, Hannah Spousta (Sousa, Michael)Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party Richard Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party Gunfighter Tactical, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party Danielle Jaymes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party John Klier(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party North County Shooting Center, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party PWGG, L.P.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party Ryan Peterson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party John Phillips(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party Cheryl Prince(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party Darin Prince(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party Lana Rae Renna(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party San Diego County Gun Owners PAC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party Laura Schwartz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party Michael Schwartz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party Second Amendment Foundation (pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party Justin Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Michael P Sousa added to party Hannah Spousta(pty:pla) (jrm).
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 OBJECTION by Xavier Becerra, Luis Lopez re #4 Notice of Related Case,, (Echeverria, John) (mme).
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Richard Bailey, Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Danielle Jaymes, John Klier, North County Shooting Center, Inc., PWGG, L.P., Ryan Peterson, John Phillips, Cheryl Prince, Darin Prince, Lana Rae Renna, San Diego County Gun Owners PAC, Laura Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, Second Amendment Foundation, Justin Smith, Hannah Spousta of case(s) 3:17-cv-1017-BEN-JLB; 3:19-cv-01537-BEN-JLB; 3:19-cv-1662-BEN-JLB . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(DiGuiseppe, Raymond) (mme).
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda)(jrd)
November 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against Xavier Becerra, Luis Lopez (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number ACASDC-14840446.), filed by Lana Rae Renna, Danielle Jaymes, Hannah Spousta, Laura Schwartz, Michael Schwartz, Richard Bailey, John Klier, Justin Smith, John Phillips, PWGG, L.P., Cheryl Prince, Darin Prince, North County Shooting Center, Inc., Ryan Peterson, Gunfighter Tactical, LLC, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., San Diego County Gun Owners PAC, Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms, Second Amendment Foundation, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2190-DMS-DEB. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case. (DiGuiseppe, Raymond)(zda)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renna et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Schwartz
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Jaymes
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin Prince
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gunfighter Tactical, LLC
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Smith
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Peterson
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Klier
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schwartz
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Prince
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Spousta
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bailey
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Phillips
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lana Rae Renna
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PWGG, L.P.
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North County Shooting Center, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego County Gun Owners PAC
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens Committee for the Right to Keep and Bear Arms
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Represented By: Michael P Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Macomber
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Freeman
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe, I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Gabrielle D. Boutin
Represented By: John Darrow Echeverria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Lopez
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Gabrielle D. Boutin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?