Airborne America, Inc. v. Kenway Composites et al
Plaintiff: Airborne America, Inc.
Defendant: Kenway Composites, Berkley Insurance Company, Susan Priest, Kenway Corporation, Kennth G. Priest, II, Terry Priest, Gemini Insurance Company, CPK Manufacturing, LLC, DOES 1-100, Creative Pultrusions, Ian Kopp, Hill & Smith Holdings, PLC and Michael Priest
Case Number: 3:2020cv02208
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Houston
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
2 Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #9 Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference via Videoconference. A Joint Discovery Plan is due 3/8/2021. The Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference is continued to 3/15/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 1/6/2021. (tcf)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Airborne America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vess, Bryan) (tcf).
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by Airborne America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vess, Bryan) (tcf).
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Berkley Insurance Company, Gemini Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Newman, Gregory) (tcf).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference via Videoconference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 1/11/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. In the event the case does not settle during the ENE, the Court will conduct an Initial Case Management Conference immediately following the ENE with counsel only. A Joint Discovery Plan due filed in the CM/ECF system no later than 1/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 12/3/2020. (tcf)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by CPK Manufacturing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Chalifoux, Anthony) (tcf).
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Creative Pultrusions. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Chalifoux, Anthony) (tcf).
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (1) Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time for Filing of Responsive Pleading; and (2) Granting Ex Parte Application for Order Extending Time to Respond. (ECF Nos. #2 , #3 ). Defendants Gemini Insurance Company and BerkleyInsurance Company must file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 9, 2020. Defendants CPK Manufacturing, LLC, Kenway Composites, and Creative Pultrusions, Inc. must file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/24/2020. (tcf)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge John A. Houston is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv2208-JLS-BLM.(no document attached) (mcb)(rmc).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Initial Complaint by Berkley Insurance Company, Gemini Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Newman, Gregory)Attorney Gregory J Newman added to party Berkley Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory J Newman added to party Gemini Insurance Company(pty:dft) (jrm).
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by CPK Manufacturing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration f Anthony S. Chalifoux, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum in support of Ex- parte Application, #3 Appendix Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Chalifoux, Anthony) (jrm).
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2020-00033257-CU-FR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14859241.), filed by Kenway Composites, Creative Pultrusions, CPK Manufacturing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 State Court Documents, #5 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2208-JAH-BLM. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Airborne America, Inc. v. Kenway Composites et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenway Composites
Represented By: Anthony Scott Chalifoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory J Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Priest
Represented By: Anthony Scott Chalifoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenway Corporation
Represented By: Anthony Scott Chalifoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennth G. Priest, II
Represented By: Anthony Scott Chalifoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Priest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemini Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory J Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPK Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Anthony Scott Chalifoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Pultrusions
Represented By: Anthony Scott Chalifoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Kopp
Represented By: Anthony Scott Chalifoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill & Smith Holdings, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Priest
Represented By: Anthony Scott Chalifoux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airborne America, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Charles Vess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?