Langer v. Zoological Society of San Diego et al
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Defendant: Zoological Society of San Diego a Domestic NonProfit doing business as San Diego Zoo Global and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 3:2020cv02227
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Filing 13 NON Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and remand of the remaining state claim filed by Chris Langer. (Handy, Russell) (jrm).
December 31, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing: In light of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. 10), the Early Neutral Evaluation set for January 27, 2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal is VACATED. Parties are to JOINTLY contact Judge Skomal's chambers within three days of a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss to update the Court re whether to set a further Early Neutral Evaluation. (no document attached) (mrm)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint : Responses due by 1/13/2021; Replies due by 1/20/2021; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
December 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Zoological Society of San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Declaration of Dennis Corbran and Exhibits In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Request for Judicial Notice and Exhibits In Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Raizman, David) (jrm).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Relief from In-Person Meet & Confer Requirement (ECF No. #8 ). The parties are NOT required to meet and confer in-person at the subject premises. They must telephonically engage in the meet and confer efforts as delineated by Paragraph 7 of the Court's 11/24/20 Order (ECF No. #7 ) on or before 1/13/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 12/22/20. (jmo)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for relief from in-person meet & confer requirement by Chris Langer. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Masanque, Isabel Rose) (jmr).
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/27/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 11/24/2020.(jrm)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Isabel Rose Masanque on behalf of Chris Langer (Masanque, Isabel Rose)Attorney Isabel Rose Masanque added to party Chris Langer(pty:pla) (mme).
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Zoological Society of San Diego.(Raizman, David)Attorney David H. Raizman added to party Zoological Society of San Diego(pty:dft)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zoological Society of San Diego re #3 Notice of Party With Financial Interest, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Mail on 11/16/2020 (Roller, Amber) (jrm).
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Zoological Society of San Diego re #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, . Identifying Other Affiliate Zoological Society of San Diego for Zoological Society of San Diego. (Roller, Amber) (jrm).
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zoological Society of San Diego. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Roller, Amber) (jrm).
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL From Superior Court of the State of California, case number 37-2020-00032979-CU-CR-CTL. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number ACASDC-14875744.), filed by Zoological Society of San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2227-AJB-BGS. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(mcb)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langer v. Zoological Society of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoological Society of San Diego a Domestic NonProfit doing business as San Diego Zoo Global
Represented By: Amber Roller
Represented By: David H. Raizman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Isabel Rose Masanque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?