Jackson v. Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Jackson
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants LLC doing business as Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants and Rainbow Investment Co.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02242
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Linda Lopez
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice (Doc. #8 ). This action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 1/4/2021. (jdt) (sjt).
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jerry Jackson with Prejudice Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(i) (Taibi, Michael) (jdt).
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Confirming Settlement and Setting Deadline to File Voluntary Dismissal or Stipulation for Dismissal. Plaintiff is ordered to file his voluntary dismissal or a stipulation for dismissal no later than 1/22/2021. If the fully executed stipulation for dismissal or voluntary dismissal is not submitted by 1/22/2021, then a Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. A Settlement Disposition Conference is set for 2/4/2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 12/10/2020.(jdt)
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Jerry Jackson (Taibi, Michael) (jdt).
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Jackson. Rainbow Investment Co. served. (Taibi, Michael) (jdt).
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Jackson. Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants LLC served. (Taibi, Michael) (jdt).
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mcb) (rmc).
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Jerry Jackson. No Parties With Financial Interest. (mcb)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14896741.), filed by Jerry Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2242-W-LL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Taibi, Michael)(mcb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants LLC doing business as Luby's Fuddruckers Restaurants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainbow Investment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Jackson
Represented By: Michael A. Taibi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?