International Franchise Association et al v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: DD Independent Franchise Owners Association, International Franchise Association, Supercuts Franchisee Association and Asian American Hotel Owners Association
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Katie Hagen, Lilia Garcia-Brower, State of California, Patrick Henning and Julie Su
Case Number: 3:2020cv02243
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Daniel E Butcher
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Amended Complaint, and on Briefing of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Alternative Motion for Abstention by Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Katie Hagen, Patrick Henning, State of California, Julie Su. (O'Grady, Sharon) (jpp).
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as Moot (ECF No. #10 ). Defendants may answer the FAC or file a responsive motion on or before 4/23/21. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/14/21. (jmo)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Katie Hagen, Patrick Henning, State of California, Julie Su, filed by Asian American Hotel Owners Association, DD Independent Franchise Owners Association, International Franchise Association, Supercuts Franchisee Association. (Marchiano, Karen) (jmo).
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Amend Complaint (ECF No. #12 ). Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint due on or before 3/26/2021. Defendants may answer or file a responsive motion on or before 4/23/21. If Defendants file a motion, the hearing date on the motion shall be 6/21/21. Plaintiffs may respond to the motion on or before 5/28/21. Defendants may file a reply on or before 6/14/21. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/11/21. (jmo)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #10 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Joint Motion Regarding Agreed Extension of Time to Amend Complaint Under FRCP 15(A) by International Franchise Association. (Marchiano, Karen) (jmo).
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Notice of Election to File Amended Complaint by March 12, 2021 In Lieu of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by International Franchise Association. (Marchiano, Karen) (jmo).
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Katie Hagen, Patrick Henning, State of California, Julie Su. (O'Grady, Sharon) (jmo).
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension (ECF No. #8 ). Defendants are to respond to the Complaint on or before 1/14/2021. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/7/20. (jmo)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint and Briefing Schedule for Anticipated Motion to Dismiss by Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Katie Hagen, Patrick Henning, State of California, Julie Su. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion)(O'Grady, Sharon) (jmo).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Sharon L. O'Grady on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Katie Hagen, Patrick Henning, State of California, Julie Su (O'Grady, Sharon)Attorney Sharon L. O'Grady added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Sharon L. O'Grady added to party Lilia Garcia-Brower(pty:dft), Attorney Sharon L. O'Grady added to party Katie Hagen(pty:dft), Attorney Sharon L. O'Grady added to party Patrick Henning(pty:dft), Attorney Sharon L. O'Grady added to party State of California(pty:dft), Attorney Sharon L. O'Grady added to party Julie Su(pty:dft)(jmo).
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Andrew Bleiman, re #4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/23/2020.(rmc)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Justin Klein, re #3 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 11/23/2020.(rmc)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14919760.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Bleiman, Andrew) (rmc).
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14919542.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Klein, Justin) (rmc).
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd)(sjt).
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, Lilia Garcia-Brower, Katie Hagen, Patrick Henning, State of California, Julie Su ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14887915.), filed by Asian American Hotel Owners Association, DD Independent Franchise Owners Association, International Franchise Association, Supercuts Franchisee Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2243-BAS-DEB. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case. (Marchiano, Karen)(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Franchise Association et al v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DD Independent Franchise Owners Association
Represented By: Karen Marchiano
Represented By: Andrew P. Bleiman
Represented By: Justin M. Klein
Represented By: Grant Nigolian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Franchise Association
Represented By: Karen Marchiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Supercuts Franchisee Association
Represented By: Karen Marchiano
Represented By: Andrew P. Bleiman
Represented By: Justin M. Klein
Represented By: Grant Nigolian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asian American Hotel Owners Association
Represented By: Karen Marchiano
Represented By: Andrew P. Bleiman
Represented By: Justin M. Klein
Represented By: Grant Nigolian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Sharon L. O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Hagen
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Sharon L. O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilia Garcia-Brower
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Sharon L. O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Sharon L. O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Henning
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Sharon L. O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Su
Represented By: Attorney General
Represented By: Sharon L. O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?