Jariwala v. Nomad Hotel Manager LA LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Krishna Jariwala
Defendant: Nomad Hotel Manager LA LLC. and DOES 1 to 10
Case Number: 3:2020cv02244
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint. Defendant must file its response to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before February 24, 2021. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/14/2021. (jmr)
January 13, 2021 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Nomad Hotel Manager LA LLC.. (Villamor, Myra)Attorney Myra B. Villamor added to party Nomad Hotel Manager LA LLC.(pty:dft) (jmr).
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Krishna Jariwala, as to Nomad Hotel Manager LA LLC. (Coelho, Thiago) (tcf).
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (vxc) (dsn)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES 1 to 10, Nomad Hotel Manager LA LLC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14888041.), filed by Krishna Jariwala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2244-JLS-MDD. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Coelho, Thiago)(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jariwala v. Nomad Hotel Manager LA LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishna Jariwala
Represented By: Thiago M. Coelho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomad Hotel Manager LA LLC.
Represented By: Myra B. Villamor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?