Betts et al v. Onewest Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Jingyi Zhang and Ronald Betts
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Chase Bank, N.A., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Onewest Bank, N.A., DOES 1 through 10, Bank of America, N.A. and CIT Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02261
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Daniel E Butcher
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Vukovic, Adam)
January 15, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Vukovic, Adam)
January 4, 2021 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jingyi Zhang, Ronald Betts. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Carll, Curtis)(jrm).
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting Second Joint Stipulated Motion to Enlarge and Modify the Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The deadline for Plaintiffs' response to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is enlarged from 12/28/2020 to 1/4/2021, and (2) the deadline for Defendants' Reply is enlarged from 1/8/2021 to 1/15/2021. Motion hearing is continued from 1/28/2021 to 3/4/2021. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/30/2020. (jrm)
December 28, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ronald Betts, Jingyi Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian T. Hicks)(Carll, Curtis)(jrm).
December 18, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Vukovic on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vukovic, Adam)Attorney Adam Vukovic added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Adam Vukovic added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft)(jrm).
December 18, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. identifying Other Affiliate HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate HSBC USA, Inc., Other Affiliate HSBC Holdings plc, United Kingdom Corporation for HSBC Bank USA, N.A. (Fredrich, Christopher) (jrm).
December 18, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, N.A..(Fredrich, Christopher)(jrm).
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1)(A). Plaintiffs shall have an additional 14 days to file their Response to the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., and (2) Defendant Bank of America, N.A. and Wells FargoBank, N.A. Reply to such Response will be extended to January 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/15/2020. (jrm)
December 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ronald Betts, Jingyi Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian T. Hicks)(Carll, Curtis)(jrm).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Joint Motion and Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant CIT Bank, N.A. to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 12.1. Defendant CIT Bank, N.A.'s deadline to respond to the Complaint, by answer, motion, or otherwise, is either (1) extended to fourteen (14) days after any ruling on Plaintiffs anticipated motion to remand; or (2) in the event Plaintiffs do not move to remand, then twenty-one (21) days after the deadline to do so has expired, up to and including 1/8/2021. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/14/2020. (jrm)
December 14, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by CIT Bank, N.A.. (Dueringer, Christopher)Attorney Christopher L Dueringer added to party CIT Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (jrm).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Joint Motion and Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant JPMORgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 12.1 Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s deadline to respond to the Complaint, by answer, motion or otherwise, is (1) extended to 14 days after any ruling on Plaintiffs anticipated motion to remand; or (2) in the event Plaintiffs do not move to remand, then 21 days after the deadline to do so has expired, up to and including 1/8/2021. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/10/2020. (jrm)
December 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Chase's Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Grotzinger, Jordan) (jrm).
December 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Hannah Shanks-Parkin by Jordan D Grotzinger on behalf of Chase Bank, N.A. (Grotzinger, Jordan) (jrm).
December 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Jordan D. Grotzinger by Jordan D Grotzinger on behalf of Chase Bank, N.A. (Grotzinger, Jordan)Attorney Jordan D Grotzinger added to party Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (jrm).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Responses due by 12/14/2020; Replies due by 12/21/2020; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(no document attached) (sc)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Miller, Kenneth)(jrm).
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Miller, Kenneth) (jrm).
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Joint Motion and Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant HSBC Bank USA, N.A. to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 12.1. HSBC Bank USA, N.A.'s deadline to respond to the Complaint, by answer, motion, or otherwise, is extended from 11/27/2020 to and including 12/18/2020. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/24/2020. (jrm)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer & Stipulation Extending Time for Def HSBC Bank to Respond to Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, N.A.. (Fredrich, Christopher)Attorney Christopher Fredrich added to party HSBC Bank USA, N.A.(pty:dft)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Bank of America, N.A. . Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Coropration, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank of America, N.A.. (Miller, Kenneth) (jrm).
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. . Identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Miller, Kenneth)(jrm).
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego County Superior Court, case number 37-2020-00005293-CU-BT-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14905746.), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2261-AJB-DEB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betts et al v. Onewest Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kenneth Sur Miller
Represented By: Adam Vukovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jordan D Grotzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher Fredrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onewest Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Kenneth Sur Miller
Represented By: Adam Vukovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIT Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher L Dueringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jingyi Zhang
Represented By: Curtis G. Carll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Betts
Represented By: Curtis G. Carll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?