Tillis v. Geico Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Ernestine Tillis
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv02294
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference held on 1/13/2021(no document attached) (ajf)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/26/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Status Conference set for 1/13/2021 08:45 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Joint Discovery Plan due 1/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 12/1/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mme)
November 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John T Brooks on behalf of Geico Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Brooks, John)Attorney John T Brooks added to party Geico Indemnity Company(pty:dft) (jmo).
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Geico Indemnity Company . Identifying Corporate Parent Geico Corporation for Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Badawi, Suzanne) (jmo).
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Geico Indemnity Company. (smd) (sjt).
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2020-00003550-CU-PA-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14932626.), filed by Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Declaration, #8 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2294-DMS-WVG. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillis v. Geico Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Suzanne Y. Badawi
Represented By: John T Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestine Tillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?