AI CA LLC v. CrediautoUSA Financial Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: AI CA LLC
Defendant: Rafael Gomez and CrediautoUSA Financial Company LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv02352
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Scheduling Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. A Case Management Conference held on 5/21/2021. A Mandatory Settlement Conference is set for 5/18/2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 5/27/2021. (tcf)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference held on 5/21/2021. The case did not settle. Scheduling Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorneys Jenny Dixon (counsel for Plaintiff) and Thomas Amon (counsel for Plaintiff in related New York state court case)). (Defendant Attorney Brandon Smith). (no document attached) (kxm)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATUS REPORT Joint Case Management Statement by AI CA LLC. (Dixon, Jenny) (tcf).
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference via Videoconference. A videoconference Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 5/21/2021 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE, the Court will immediately thereafter hold a Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 3/10/2021. (tcf)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by CrediautoUSA Financial Company LLC, Rafael Gomez.(Smith, Brandon)Attorney Brandon M. Smith added to party CrediautoUSA Financial Company LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brandon M. Smith added to party Rafael Gomez(pty:dft) (tcf).
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AI CA LLC, as to Rafael Gomez. (Dixon, Jenny) (tcf).
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AI CA LLC, as to CrediautoUSA Financial Company LLC. (Dixon, Jenny) (tcf).
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (sjt).
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by AI CA LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent Arena SPV Manager, LLC, Other Affiliate Arena Investors, LP for AI CA LLC. (smd) (sjt).
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CrediautoUSA Financial Company LLC, Rafael Gomez ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-14975077.), filed by AI CA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2352-MMA-AHG. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Dixon, Jenny)(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AI CA LLC v. CrediautoUSA Financial Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Gomez
Represented By: Brandon M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CrediautoUSA Financial Company LLC
Represented By: Brandon M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AI CA LLC
Represented By: Jenny L. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?