McEwen et al v. Benedict et al
Plaintiff: Carla McEwen and Daniel Buzahr
Defendant: Amanda Benedict, DOES 1-10, Walt Disney Realty doing business as Dennis Conklin, Shoot For The Moon Sales Consultants LLC, Shoot For The Moon, LLC (Florida), Dennis Conklin, Audie Decastro, Windermere Cocoa Beach Realty, Shoot For The Moon, LLC (Arizona) and CNA Foreclosure Services Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02364
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address by Valerie Garcia Hong (Hong, Valerie)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Joint Request for a Settlement Conference Video Settlement Conference set for 3/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 1/27/2021. (jmr) (jms).
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Refer to Mediation - Settlement Conference by Carla McEwen. (Baldwin-Kennedy, Ronda) (anh).
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: After reviewing Plaintiffs Request for Deferral of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Pending Disposition of Mediation [Doc. No. 20], and good cause appearing, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion hearing date previously set for the two pending motions to dismiss [Doc. Nos. 16, 17] is continued to March 15, 2021. Accordingly, Plaintiffs opposition to both pending motions shall be filed on or before March 1, 2021, and Defendants shall file their replies on or before March 8, 2021. The Court will then take the motions under submission and issue a ruling in due course. (anh)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY - Other re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Special Motion to Strike filed by Carla McEwen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email, #2 Exhibit Email, #3 Exhibit Letter)(Baldwin-Kennedy, Ronda) (anh).
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/4/2021. Prior Court Minute Order issued.(Court Reporter/ECR Mauralee Ramirez). (Plaintiff Attorney Ronda Baldwin-Kennedy). (Defendant Attorney Pauline Villanueva and John Robert Mayer). (no document attached) (lmh)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER : Pursuant to the parties representations to the Court that the Notice of Default has been rescinded and there is no foreclosure sale currently scheduled, Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. No. 8] is deemed WITHDRAWN without prejudice and can be refiled, if appropriate, at a future date(jmr)(jms).
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Special Motion to Strike by Dennis Conklin, Shoot For The Moon Sales Consultants LLC, Walt Disney Realty, Windermere Cocoa Beach Realty. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and Special Motion to Strike Under California Code of Civil Procedure Section 425.16)(Mayer, John)Attorney John Robert Mayer added to party Dennis Conklin(pty:dft), Attorney John Robert Mayer added to party Shoot For The Moon Sales Consultants LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Robert Mayer added to party Walt Disney Realty(pty:dft), Attorney John Robert Mayer added to party Windermere Cocoa Beach Realty(pty:dft) (jpp).
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Audie Decastro. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Notice of Association of Counsel)(Hong, Valerie)Attorney Valerie Garcia Hong added to party Audie Decastro(pty:dft) (jpp).
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Amanda Benedict. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Notice of Association of Counsel)(Hong, Valerie)Attorney Valerie Garcia Hong added to party Amanda Benedict(pty:dft) 0 (jpp).
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: In response to Plaintiffs motion for a temporary restraining order to halt a foreclosure sale scheduled for December 22, 2020 [Doc. No. 8], defendants Dennis Conklin and Shoot for the Moon DBPP have represented to the Court that the Notice of Default has been rescinded, rendering moot the request for a TRO. [Doc. No. 11.] The hearing previously scheduled for December 21, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. is therefore VACATED as moot. A telephonic status hearing is HEREBY SET for January 4, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. to address scheduling a preliminary injunction hearing, if needed. The parties are instructed to connect through an AT&T Teleconference connection at (888) 398-2342, access code: 1749358. Status Conference set for 1/4/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo. (anh)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Audie Decastro. (Hong, Valerie) (anh).
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Amanda Benedict. (Hong, Valerie) (anh).
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Dennis Conklin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John R. Mayer in Support of Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Mayer, John) (anh).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE Certificate Of Service by Daniel Buzahr, Carla McEwen re #9 Order,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, #8 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Baldwin-Kennedy, Ronda) (anh).
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: On December 10, 2020, Plaintiffs Carla McEwen and Daniel Buzahar filed a motion for preliminary injunction/TRO (the motion). [Doc. No. 8.] Any opposition to the motion shall be filed by noon on December 18, 2020. The motion is HEREBY SET for a telephonic hearing before District Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on December 21, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are instructed to connect through an AT&T Teleconference connection at (888) 398-2342, access code: 1749358. Plaintiffs shall provide notice to all of the defendants of the hearing and this order as expeditiously as possible.(anh)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Daniel Buzahr, Carla McEwen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Ronda Kennedy ISO Motion For Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration Of Ronda Kennedy ISO Motion For Preliminary Injunction)(Baldwin-Kennedy, Ronda) (anh).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Buzahr, Carla McEwen. Shoot For The Moon Sales Consultants LLC, Shoot For The Moon, LLC (Arizona), Shoot For The Moon, LLC (Florida) served. (Baldwin-Kennedy, Ronda) (anh).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Buzahr, Carla McEwen. Audie Decastro served. (Baldwin-Kennedy, Ronda) (anh).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Buzahr, Carla McEwen. CNA Foreclosure Services Inc. served. (Baldwin-Kennedy, Ronda) (anh).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Buzahr, Carla McEwen. Amanda Benedict served. (Baldwin-Kennedy, Ronda) (anh).
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Daniel Buzahr, Carla McEwen (Baldwin-Kennedy, Ronda) (anh).
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (sjt).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Amanda Benedict, CNA Foreclosure Services Inc., Dennis Conklin, DOES 1-10, Audie Decastro, Shoot For The Moon Sales Consultants LLC, Shoot For The Moon, LLC (Arizona), Shoot For The Moon, LLC (Florida), Walt Disney Realty, Windermere Cocoa Beach Realty ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-14987317.), filed by Daniel Buzahr, Carla McEwen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2364-CAB-LL. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Baldwin-Kennedy, Ronda)(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McEwen et al v. Benedict et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Benedict
Represented By: Valerie Garcia Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Disney Realty doing business as Dennis Conklin
Represented By: John Robert Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoot For The Moon Sales Consultants LLC
Represented By: John Robert Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoot For The Moon, LLC (Florida)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Conklin
Represented By: John Robert Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audie Decastro
Represented By: Valerie Garcia Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windermere Cocoa Beach Realty
Represented By: John Robert Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoot For The Moon, LLC (Arizona)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Foreclosure Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla McEwen
Represented By: Ronda Baldwin-Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Buzahr
Represented By: Ronda Baldwin-Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?