Frost v. Child and Family Services of San Bernardino County
Plaintiff: Ryan Frost
Defendant: Child and Family Services of San Bernardino County and San Bernardino Juvenile Court
Case Number: 3:2020cv02402
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331vc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION for Failure to Pay Filing Fees Required by 28 U.S.C. 1914(a). The Court GRANTS Plaintiff thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to re-open his case by: (a) Prepaying the entire $400 civil filing and administrative fee required by 28 U.S.C. 1914(a) in full; or (b) Completing and filing a Motion to Proceed IFP with an affidavit that includes a statement of all Plaintiff's assets as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1) and S.D. Cal. CivLR 3.2(b). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 1/6/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 Status Review Report by Plaintiff Ryan Frost. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Janis L. Sammartino Accepting Document: Status Review Report, from Plaintiff Ryan Frost. Non-compliance with local rule(s), LR 5(1)(h): Filer is not a party to the cases; LR 5.1(j): Improper title. Nunc Pro Tunc 12/24/2020. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 12/28/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Child and Family Services of San Bernardino County, San Bernardino Juvenile Court (Filing fee Due $ 402.), filed by Ryan Frost. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2402-JLS-BLM. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(mcb) (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frost v. Child and Family Services of San Bernardino County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Child and Family Services of San Bernardino County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Bernardino Juvenile Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?