Powell et al v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elijha Gonzalez, Dearl Powell and Christina Gast
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Does 1 through 50 and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02412
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 lm
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: (1) Denying #8 Motion to Dismiss; (2) Granting #8 Motion to Strike; and (3) Denying #9 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/2/2021. (mme)
January 21, 2021 Filing 17 Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting #8 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint, #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 1/25/2021 is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE . Transfer REJECTED. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/19/2021. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 1/19/2021.(mme) Modified on 1/20/2021 to reflect transfer rejected (mme).
January 15, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Christina Gast, Elijha Gonzalez, Dearl Powell. (Lee, Larry) (mme).
January 15, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart, Inc.. (Peracchio, Paloma) (mme).
January 14, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart, Inc. of case(s) 3:18-cv-00500-L-MDD . (Peracchio, Paloma) (mme).
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Christina Gast, Elijha Gonzalez, Dearl Powell. (Lee, Larry) (mme).
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Andrew Cook in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Remand, #2 Declaration oof Laura Kish in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Remand, #3 Declaration of of Paloma Peracchio in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Remand)(Peracchio, Paloma) (mme).
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, Re Filing of Notice of Removal and Notice to Clerk in the San Diego County Superior Court and Service of Notice of Removal on Plaintiff; and Filing of Proof of Service by Defendants Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart, Inc.. (Peracchio, Paloma) (mme).
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Christina Gast, Elijha Gonzalez, Dearl Powell. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand)(Lee, Larry) (mme).
December 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Peracchio, Paloma) (mme).
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Sangwon Hyun on behalf of Christina Gast, Elijha Gonzalez, Dearl Powell (Hyun, Dennis)Attorney Dennis Sangwon Hyun added to party Christina Gast(pty:pla), Attorney Dennis Sangwon Hyun added to party Elijha Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Dennis Sangwon Hyun added to party Dearl Powell(pty:pla) (mme).
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Louise Franklin on behalf of Christina Gast, Elijha Gonzalez, Dearl Powell (Franklin, Laura)Attorney Laura Louise Franklin added to party Christina Gast(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Louise Franklin added to party Elijha Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Laura Louise Franklin added to party Dearl Powell(pty:pla) (mme).
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell A. Wrosch on behalf of Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart, Inc. (Wrosch, Mitchell)Attorney Mitchell A. Wrosch added to party Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mitchell A. Wrosch added to party Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mitchell A. Wrosch added to party Walmart, Inc.(pty:dft) (mme).
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kwanporn Tulyathan on behalf of Christina Gast, Elijha Gonzalez, Dearl Powell (Tulyathan, Kwanporn)Attorney Kwanporn Tulyathan added to party Christina Gast(pty:pla), Attorney Kwanporn Tulyathan added to party Elijha Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kwanporn Tulyathan added to party Dearl Powell(pty:pla) *QC Mailer sent instructing filer to "flatten" pdf documents when filing* (mme). (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/14/2020) (mme).
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard James Fitzpatrick on behalf of Christina Gast, Elijha Gonzalez, Dearl Powell (Fitzpatrick, Bernard)Attorney Bernard James Fitzpatrick added to party Christina Gast(pty:pla), Attorney Bernard James Fitzpatrick added to party Elijha Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Bernard James Fitzpatrick added to party Dearl Powell(pty:pla) (mme).
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart, Inc. (mcb) (rmc).
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15029402.), filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Documents, #3 Declaration Laura Kush, #4 Declaration Paloma Peracchio, #5 Proof of Service, #6 Notice)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2412-BEN-LL. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(mcb) (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell et al v. Walmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Paloma P. Peracchio
Represented By: Mitchell A. Wrosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Paloma P. Peracchio
Represented By: Mitchell A. Wrosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Paloma P. Peracchio
Represented By: Mitchell A. Wrosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijha Gonzalez
Represented By: Larry W. Lee
Represented By: Bernard James Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Dennis Sangwon Hyun
Represented By: Laura Louise Franklin
Represented By: Kwanporn Tulyathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dearl Powell
Represented By: Larry W. Lee
Represented By: Bernard James Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Dennis Sangwon Hyun
Represented By: Laura Louise Franklin
Represented By: Kwanporn Tulyathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Gast
Represented By: Larry W. Lee
Represented By: Bernard James Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Dennis Sangwon Hyun
Represented By: Laura Louise Franklin
Represented By: Kwanporn Tulyathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?