Reed v. Newsom
Plaintiff: Mychal Andra Reed
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Case Number: 3:2020cv02439
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION in Support of Complaint #1 by Plaintiff Mychal Andra Reed. Nunc Pro Tunc 1/14/2021.(jms)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Accepting Document: Declaration in Support of Complaint, from Plaintiff Mychal Andra Reed. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Fed. R. Civ. P. l5(d) - Supplemental pleadings require court order. Nunc Pro Tunc 1/14/2021. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/19/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin assigned to transfer case from the Northern District of California.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jms)(jrd)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from the Northern District of California; Case Number 3:20-cv-08018-JCS. Original file received electronically.
December 11, 2020 Mailed copy of Order #7 and docket sheet to plaintiff at RJD.(ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2020). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2020.]
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. This action is transferred to the Southern District of CA. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/10/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2020.]
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 Letter dated 11/22/20 from Mychal Reed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2020.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mychal Andra Reed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2020: #2 Exhibit) (hdjS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2020.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2020.]
November 20, 2020 Mailed copy of #2 to plaintiff. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2020.]
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael A. Reed. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2020.]
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 12/21/2020. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2020.]
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gavin Newsom. Filed by Mychal A. Reed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 letter, #3 letter)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2020: #4 Declaration) (wsnS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/8/2020 (ljf, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mychal Andra Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?