Haggerty v. Siry Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Haggerty
Defendant: John Siry doing business as CFO, Reza Siry doing business as CEO and Siry Incorporated doing business as Siry Auto Group
Counter Claimant: Siry Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2020cv02526
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D Holt on behalf of Siry Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Holt, Christopher)Attorney Christopher D Holt added to party Siry Incorporated(pty:cc), Attorney Christopher D Holt added to party Siry Incorporated(pty:dft) (anh).
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Counter Defendant Patrick Haggerty (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Patrick Haggerty. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Leeds, Paul)
January 28, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Haggerty. Siry Incorporated served. (anh)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Haggerty. Reza Siry served. (anh)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Haggerty. John Siry served. (anh)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 1/28/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Patrick Haggerty by Siry Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Leeds, Paul)Attorney Paul J Leeds added to party Siry Incorporated(pty:dft) (anh).
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Siry, Reza Siry, Siry Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CAS126545.), filed by Patrick Haggerty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2526-CAB-NLS. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case.(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haggerty v. Siry Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Siry doing business as CFO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reza Siry doing business as CEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siry Incorporated doing business as Siry Auto Group
Represented By: Paul J Leeds
Represented By: Christopher D Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Siry Incorporated
Represented By: Paul J Leeds
Represented By: Christopher D Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?