PMA Companies v. Genox Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: PMA Companies
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, Laird Transportation, LLC, Genox Transportation, Inc., Cleancor LNG, LLC and Jason Laird
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Applied LNG Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv02540
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Ruth Bermudez Montenegro
2 Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Applied LNG Technologies, LLC by Genox Transportation, Inc. (Scordalakis, Steven)Attorney Steven A. Scordalakis added to party Genox Transportation, Inc.(pty:crd) (tcf).
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #6 Plaintiff and Defendant Genox Transportation Inc.'s Stipulated Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. The Court will hold the ENE and CMC in abeyance for thirty days for purposes of allowing additional time for service to be effectuated as against remaining Defendant, Laird Transportation, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro on 2/1/2021. (tcf)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Third-Party Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Applied LNG Technologies, LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent PMG Global, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Other Affiliate Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Chubb Insurance Company of North America for Applied LNG Technologies, LLC, Applied LNG Technologies, LLC, Applied LNG Technologies, LLC. (Lockwood, Christopher) (tcf).
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Jason Laird, filed by Applied LNG Technologies, LLC. New Summons Requested. (Lockwood, Christopher) (tcf).
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Genox Transportation, Inc., Laird Transportation, LLC by Applied LNG Technologies, LLC. (Lockwood, Christopher) (tcf).
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Applied LNG Technologies, LLC re #10 Notice of Party With Financial Interest, filed by Applied LNG Technologies, LLC, #8 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, filed by Applied LNG Technologies, LLC, #9 Third Party Complaint filed by Applied LNG Technologies, LLC. (Lockwood, Christopher) (tcf).
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #11 *** NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Applied LNG Technologies, LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent PMG Global, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Everest Indemnity Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Chubb North American Claims for Applied LNG Technologies, LLC. (Lockwood, Christopher) QC mailer sent re: document not signed (tcf). Modified to withdraw on 2/1/2021 (tcf).
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #11 *** THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Cleancor LNG, LLC, Jason Laird, filed by Applied LNG Technologies, LLC. New Summons Requested. (Lockwood, Christopher) QC mailer sent re: document not signed (tcf). Modified to withdraw on 2/1/2021 (tcf).
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #11 *** ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Genox Transportation, Inc., Laird Transportation, LLC by Applied LNG Technologies, LLC.(Lockwood, Christopher)Attorney Christopher D. Lockwood added to party Applied LNG Technologies, LLC(pty:dft) QC mailer sent re: document not signed (tcf). Modified to withdraw on 2/1/2021 (tcf).
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER. Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 20-cv-02540-JLS-RBM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 1/26/2021. Motions set before Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. (tcf)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Continue EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION CONFERENCE AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by PMA Companies. (Leath, David) (tcf).
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Proof of Service by Genox Transportation, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Jury Demand (Mijanovic, Krsto) (tcf).
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. A video conference Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 2/12/2021 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. If the case does not settle during the ENE, the Court will conduct a Case Management Conference. A Joint Discovery Plan is due 2/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 1/4/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Genox Transportation, Inc. (smd) (sjt).
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Genox Transportation, Inc. (smd) (sjt).
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15139386.), filed by Genox Transportation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Declaration)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2540-JLS-MSB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.(smd)(sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PMA Companies v. Genox Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laird Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genox Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleancor LNG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PMA Companies
Represented By: David Michael Leath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Applied LNG Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?