Maag v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Robert Maag, Anthony Bell, Wendell Coval and Nick Sternard
Defendant: DOES 1-50, U.S. Bancorp and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 3:2021cv00031
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anthony Bell, Wendell Coval, Robert Maag, Nick Sternard (Wynne, Edward) (jmr).
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant U.S. Bank must file any response to Plaintiffs second amended complaint on or before March 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/10/2021. (jmr)
February 10, 2021 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #14 Amended Complaint, by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association. (Houser, Donald) (jmr).
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #8 Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss as Moot. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/3/2021. (jmr) (jms).
February 2, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: (1)VIOLATION OF THE CALIFORNIA CONSUMER PRIVACY ACT (Civil Code, 1798.150, et seq) (2)VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIAS UNFAIR COMPETITION LAW (Bus. & Prof. Code, 17200) against All Defendants, filed by Robert Maag. (Righetti, Michael) (jmr).
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Submitting Motion to Dismiss. The Court determines the matter is appropriate for resolution without oral argument, submits the motion on the parties papers, and vacates the hearing. Plaintiffs opposition remains due by February 2, 2021. Defendants reply remains due by February 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/1/2021.(jmr) (jms).
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Donald MacKaye Houser, re #9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/1/2021.(rmc)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Kristine M. Brown, re #10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 2/1/2021.(rmc)
January 27, 2021 Filing 10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-15285936.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Brown, Kristine)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-15282212.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Houser, Donald) (rmc).
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Rule 12(b)(6) by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Partial Motion To Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Akerman, Alexander) (jmr).
January 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Wynne on behalf of Robert Maag (Wynne, Edward)Attorney Edward J. Wynne added to party Robert Maag(pty:pla) (jmr).
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association. Notice of Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Akerman, Alexander) (jmr).
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association re #4 Notice of Related Case, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Notice of Party With Financial Interest, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Akerman, Alexander) (jmr).
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association of case(s) 0:20-cv-02101-DSD-KMM . (Akerman, Alexander) (jmr).
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association Plaintiff Robert Maag. Identifying Corporate Parent US Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association. (Akerman, Alexander) (jmr).
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association.. (Akerman, Alexander) (jmr).
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15182165.), filed by U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bancorp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Declaration)The new case number is 3:21-cv-31-H-LL. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maag v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp
Represented By: Alexander Akerman
Represented By: Donald MacKaye Houser
Represented By: Kristine M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Alexander Akerman
Represented By: Donald MacKaye Houser
Represented By: Kristine M. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Maag
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Represented By: Edward J. Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bell
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Coval
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Sternard
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?