Corbett et al v. PharmaCare U.S., Inc.
Plaintiff: Damaris Luciano, Montiqueno Corbett and Rob Dobbs
Defendant: PharmaCare U.S., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00137
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/22/21. (dlg)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by PharmaCare U.S., Inc.. (Orzano, Joseph)Attorney Joseph J. Orzano added to party PharmaCare U.S., Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Montiqueno Corbett, Damaris Luciano, Rob Dobbs. PharmaCare U.S., Inc. served. (Straus, Alex) (dlg).
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (sjt).
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against PharmaCare U.S., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15272889.), filed by Montiqueno Corbett, Damaris Luciano, Rob Dobbs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:21-cv-137-GPC-AGS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Straus, Alex)(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corbett et al v. PharmaCare U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damaris Luciano
Represented By: Alex Rafael Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montiqueno Corbett
Represented By: Alex Rafael Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob Dobbs
Represented By: Alex Rafael Straus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PharmaCare U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Joseph J. Orzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?