Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC v. Munoz et al
Plaintiff: Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC
Defendant: Synchrony Bank, Internal Revenue Service, County of San Diego Department of Child Support Services, Vista Verde Master Association, Does 1 Through 10, Gisela Ivette Zamingir, Alejandro C. Munoz, MCT Group Inc. and GE Money Bank, a financial entity
Case Number: 3:2021cv00172
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1441ij
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit)(Green, Tijuhna) (mme).
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Katz on behalf of County of San Diego Department of Child Support Services (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Katz, Alexa)Attorney Alexa Katz added to party County of San Diego Department of Child Support Services(pty:dft) (mme).
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to extend Defendant the Internal Revenue Service's time to respond to complaint to on or before 3/01/2021. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 2/12/2021. (jpp)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC re #4 Response in Opposition to Motion with Proof of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Matayron, Nicolas) (mme).
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response with Proof of Service filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC. (Matayron, Nicolas) (mme).
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by Internal Revenue Service. (Green, Tijuhna) (mme).
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by County of San Diego Department of Child Support Services. (zda)(jrd)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, Fee Waived, filed by the Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents)The new case number is 3:21-cv-172-BEN-AGS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(zda)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC v. Munoz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Tijuhna Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego Department of Child Support Services
Represented By: Alexa Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vista Verde Master Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gisela Ivette Zamingir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro C. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCT Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Money Bank, a financial entity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Nicolas Matayron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?