Ghebrehiwet v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robel Ghebrehiwet
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC and Robinhood Securities, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00214
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Ruben B Brooks
2 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Filing 16 Transfer Letter Received from California Northern District. Case number in other court is 3:21-cv-01739 (jpp)
March 11, 2021 Filing 15 Case transferred to District of Northern District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of California*.*450 Golden Gate Avenue, 16th Floor**San Francisco, CA 94102-3434*. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order of Transfer) (jrm)
March 10, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s). Motion Hearing to Change Venue is vacated due to the parties stipulation to change venue. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
March 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC re #10 MOTION to Change Venue (Wisoff, Carl) (jrm).
March 10, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Change Venue by Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Wisoff, Carl) (jrm).
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #10 MOTION to Change Venue : Responses due by 3/17/2021; Replies due by 3/24/2021; sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
March 2, 2021 Filing 10 ***Document withdrawn per Doc. #13 *** MOTION to Change Venue by Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Brandon Wisoff in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Wisoff, Carl) (jrm). Modified to withdraw on 3/11/2021 (jrm).
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks recuses from this case and is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler for all further Magistrate Judge proceedings. The new case number is 21cv0214-AJB(AGS).(no document attached) (jsp)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Complaint. The Court hereby grants the parties' joint motion to extend Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint from 2/26/2021 to 4/16/2021. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/19/2021. (jrm)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Monek Anderson on behalf of Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Monek Anderson, Eric)Attorney Eric D. Monek Anderson added to party Robinhood Financial LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Eric D. Monek Anderson added to party Robinhood Markets, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric D. Monek Anderson added to party Robinhood Securities, LLC(pty:dft) (jrm).
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Robinhood Markets, Inc., Other Affiliate Robinhood Financial LLC, Other Affiliate Robinhood Securities, LLC for Robinhood Markets, Inc. (Wisoff, Carl) (jrm).
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Brandon Wisoff in Support of Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Complaint)(Wisoff, Carl) (jrm).
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Brandon Wisoff on behalf of Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Wisoff, Carl)Attorney Carl Brandon Wisoff added to party Robinhood Financial LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Carl Brandon Wisoff added to party Robinhood Markets, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Carl Brandon Wisoff added to party Robinhood Securities, LLC(pty:dft) (jrm).
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robel Ghebrehiwet. Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC served. (Peterson, Rebecca) (jrm).
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mcb) (sjt).
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15331412.), filed by Robel Ghebrehiwet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-214-AJB-RBB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Peterson, Rebecca)(mcb)(sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ghebrehiwet v. Robinhood Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robel Ghebrehiwet
Represented By: Rebecca A. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Securities, LLC
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?