Virgie Flores v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vergie Flores
Respondent: Does 1-50, inclusive and Home Depot U.S.A, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00462
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
2 Judge: Marilyn L Huff
3 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 lm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 5/10/2021.(jrm)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER (AGS): On May 10, 2021, the Court held a Case Management Conference. A scheduling order will follow. The Early Neutral Evaluation is reset to July 22, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. ENE briefs are now due July 12, 2021. All other provisions of this Court's original ENE order (ECF #22 ) remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 5/10/2021. (no document attached) (say)
April 30, 2021 Filing 25 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Home Depot U.S.A, Inc. re #22 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference, (Knopp, Gregory) (jrm).
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER (AGS): The parties' joint motion to continue the Early Neutral Evaluation (ECF #23 ) is granted. A new date will be set at the Case Management Conference on May 10, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 4/27/2021. (no document attached) (say)
April 26, 2021 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Continue Joint Stipulation to Reschedule Early Neutral Evaluation by Home Depot U.S.A, Inc.. (Knopp, Gregory) (jrm).
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Joint Discovery Plan due 4/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 3/25/2021.(jrm)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER (AGS): In light of the order transferring this case to Magistrate Judge Schopler (ECF #20 ), the previous Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Case Management Conference, and Telephonic Status Conference (ECF #18 ) is vacated. A new Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference will follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 3/25/2021. (no document attached) (say)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler for all further proceedings. Judge Michael M. Anello, Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo no longer assigned to case. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge(s) have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge(s). Create association to 3:19-cv-01766-AJB-AGS. The new case number is 21-cv-00462-AJB-AGS. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 3/24/2021. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/24/2021. (tcf)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Marilyn L. Huff hereby recuses from this case and directs the Clerk to randomly reassign this case to another district judge. This case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Michael M. Anello for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn L. Huff is no longer assigned to this case. The new case number is 21-cv-0462-MMA-WVG. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/23/2021. (no document attached) (smy)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Case Management Conference, and Telephonic Status Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo via Zoom videoconference. Attorneys-only telephonic Status Conference set for 4/28/2021 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Joint Discovery Plan due 4/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/16/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmr)
March 16, 2021 Filing 17 Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (no document attached) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:20-cv-02215. Original file received electronically
March 15, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's Final Ruling. The matters are ordered transferred to the United States District Court, Southern District of California. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) Modified on 3/16/2021 (lom). [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
December 10, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. For reasons stated on the record, the Court consolidates this action with Janelly Sandoval v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., et al., EDCV 20-457-GW-SHKx for pretrial purposes. Counsel are directed to make all future filings in the EDCV 20-457-GW-SHKx matter and the Clerk's Office is directed to add the parties and counsel in EDCV 20-457-GW-SHKx. The Court sets a status conference for January 7, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Parties are to meet and confer re scheduling, and file a joint status report by noon on January 5, 2021. Cases associated with Lead Case 5:20-cv-00457. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Thursday's 12/10/2020 scheduling conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 15, filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc... (Knopp, Gregory) [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/30/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:20-cv-00457-GW(SHKx). Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:20-cv-02215-GW(SHKx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (ap) [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE Notice to Parties and Counsel of: (1) Notice of Assignment; (2) Notice of Court-Directed ADR Program filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Knopp, Gregory) [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., of Notice to Adverse Parties and to the Superior Court of Removal to Federal Court served on 10/22/2020. (Knopp, Gregory) [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
October 21, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, inclusive, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Vergie Flores. Filed in State Court on 10/21/20 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
October 21, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, inclusive, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Vergie Flores. Filed in State Court on 7/23/2020 Submitted with Attachment 4 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
October 21, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit H to Notice of Removal #1 (car) [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Home Depot U S A Inc. Related Case(s): 5:20-cv-00457-GW-SHK (Knopp, Gregory) [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Home Depot U S A Inc, identifying The Home Depot, Inc., parent company of Home Depot USA, Inc., and Plaintiff Vergie Flores. (Knopp, Gregory) [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Home Depot U S A Inc. (Knopp, Gregory) [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS2013065 Receipt No: ACACDC-28646533 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Home Depot U S A Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Christie in Support of Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.'s Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Christie Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Christie Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Christie Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Christie Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Christie Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Christie Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Christie Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Christie Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Christie Declaration, #11 Declaration of G. Edward Anderson in Support of Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.'s Notice of Removal, #12 Declaration of A. Solis in Support of Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc.'s Notice of Removal, #13 Defendant's Certificate of Service of its Notice of Removal and Supporting Documents) (Attorney Gregory W Knopp added to party Home Depot U S A Inc(pty:dft))(Knopp, Gregory) [Transferred from California Central on 3/16/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virgie Flores v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Does 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Home Depot U.S.A, Inc.
Represented By: Victor A Salcedo
Represented By: Gregory W Knopp
Represented By: Jonathan S. Christie
Represented By: Victor Angel Salcedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vergie Flores
Represented By: Armond Marced Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?