Fahlsing v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Kathleen Fahlsing
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of America and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00468
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: M James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/28/2021 at 2:00pm. Discovery Plan due 6/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 5/12/2021.(jpp)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Life Insurance Company of North America . Identifying Corporate Parent New York Life Insurance Company for Life Insurance Company of North America. (Rucker, Cindy) (jpp).
May 7, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Rucker, Cindy) (jpp).
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion for Extension. Defendant has until May 7, 2021 to file a response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/08/2021. (jpp)
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Rucker, Cindy)Attorney Cindy Mekari Rucker added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) (jpp).
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathleen Fahlsing. Life Insurance Company of North America served. (Brehm, Brent) (jpp).
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kathleen Fahlsing (Brehm, Brent) (jpp).
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mcb)(jrd)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-15524839.), filed by Kathleen Fahlsing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-468-L-KSC. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Brehm, Brent)(mcb)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fahlsing v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Fahlsing
Represented By: Brent Dorian Brehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Cindy Mekari Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?