Dunscomb v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Jonathan Dunscomb
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2021cv00553
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Q Hayes
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE AND ORDER: for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference is set for 7/23/2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. A Joint Discovery Plan is due by 7/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 5/24/2021.(ag)
May 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Life Insurance Company of North America . Identifying Corporate Parent New York Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Life Insurance Company of North America ("LINA") for Life Insurance Company of North America. (Blohm, Nicole) (ag).
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Ingram, Grant) (ag).
April 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant E. Ingram on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Ingram, Grant)Attorney Grant E. Ingram added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) (ag).
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Joint Motion (ECF No. #5 ) is granted. The time within which a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint must be filed and served by Defendant is extended to 5/21/2021. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/12/2021. (ag)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Blohm, Nicole)Attorney Nicole Y. Blohm added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) (ag).
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Dunscomb. Life Insurance Company of North America served. (Bather, Phillip) (jmo).
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties by Jonathan Dunscomb (Bather, Phillip) (jmr).
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda) (jms).
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15566287.), filed by Jonathan Dunscomb. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-553-WQH-AGS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Bather, Phillip)(zda)(jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunscomb v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Dunscomb
Represented By: Phillip Sinclair Bather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Nicole Y. Blohm
Represented By: Grant E. Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?