Allen v. Diaz et al
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Allen
Defendant: Travis, Ralph Diaz, Martinez, J. Lyon and W.L. Montgomery
Case Number: 3:2021cv00602
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Ruth Bermudez Montenegro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Dismissing Civil Action without Prejudice for Failing to Prepay Filing Fees, and denying #3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Plaintiff is GRANTED forty-five (45) days leave from the date this Order is filed to prepay the entire $402 civil filing and administrative fee in full; or complete and file a Motion to Proceed IFP.Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/1/2021. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; court approved IFP motion mailed to plaintiff)(jmr)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Larry Alan Burns Accepting re #1 Complaint, from Plaintiff Charles Edward Allen. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Initial case filings (42 U.S.C. 1983 Complaint, Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, etc.) received by U.S. Mail and not properly e-filed in accordance with S.D. Cal. General Order 653A. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/7/2021.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Charles Edward Allen. (jms)
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Edward Allen. (jms)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ralph Diaz, J. Lyon, Martinez, W.L. Montgomery, Travis, filed by Charles Edward Allen.($402 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-602-LAB-RBM. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.L. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?